Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2479528

EP2479528 - Vehicle door safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ackermann, Klaus
Alpha Armouring Panzerung GmbH Zeppelin Str. 27
85748 Garching / DE
[2012/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)Treml, Marius
T&P Treml Pohl Berzl & Partner PartG mbB
Rosenstrasse 8
93413 Cham / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/30](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date11005691.812.07.2011
[2012/30]
Priority number, dateDE2011100911721.01.2011         Original published format: DE102011009117
[2012/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2479528
Date:25.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/30]
ClassificationInternational:F41H5/22, F41H7/04
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugtürsicherheitseinrichtung[2012/30]
English:Vehicle door safety device[2012/30]
French:Dispositif de sécurité pour une porte de véhicule[2012/30]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
03.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
05.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201505   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2016
Cited inby applicant DE102005060604
  DE19960944
  DE19628065