Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2413292

EP2413292 - Method for analysing the function and/or data of a number of devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Financial Services AG
Gifhorner Strasse 57
38112 Braunschweig / DE
[2012/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Schöner, Friedrich
Hasendamm 81
31275 Lehrte / DE
02 / Hahn, Anke
Spinnerstraße 36
38114 Braunschweig / DE
03 / Bürdek, Horst Dr.
Smetanastraße 23
01662 Meißen / DE
 [2012/05]
Representative(s)Meyer, Enno
Tegel & Meyer Patentanwälte Planegger Str. 16
82110 Germering / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date11005964.921.07.2011
[2012/05]
Priority number, dateDE2010103246328.07.2010         Original published format: DE102010032463
[2012/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2413292
Date:01.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2413292
Date:03.04.2013
Language:DE
[2013/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G07C5/00, G07C5/08, G07B15/06
[2012/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/05]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Analyse der Funktion und/oder Daten einer Vielzahl von Vorrichtungen[2012/05]
English:Method for analysing the function and/or data of a number of devices[2012/05]
French:Procédé d'analyse de la fonction et/ou des données d'une multitude de dispositifs[2012/05]
Examination procedure27.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
16.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2013Fee for grant paid
18.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.2013   
Toll Collect GmbH
Linkstrasse 4
10785 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Tanner, Andreas, et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
12.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition01.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0280/16
31.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.07.2011
AL03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
LU21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT21.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2017/49]HU21.07.2011
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
LU21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
AT21.07.2016
Former [2015/34]HU21.07.2011
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
LU21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/32]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MK03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
SM03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2014/33]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IE21.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/23]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
BE31.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/14]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/11]CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/09]CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/52]CY03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/51]FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/50]FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RS03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/49]FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI03.04.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006092066  (SWISS REINSURANCE CO [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - line 26 * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 26 * * page 6, line 12 - page 9, line 19 * * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 7 *;
 [X]DE102009045815  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0007] - [0013] - [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0026] , [0061] - [0070] - [0076] , [0078] - [0080] *;
 [A]DE102004039286  (SU HASAN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003097335  (MOSKOWITZ PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0021] - [0023] - [0046] - [0049] *;
 [A]US2008263100  (VAN ENGELSHOVEN KAI [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] - [0017] - [0020] , [0024] *
by applicantDE102008046777