Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2415620

EP2415620 - Trailer coupling with a sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.02.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[2012/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Sielhorst, Bernhard
Ostmarkstraße 26
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
 [2012/06]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/17]Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Essslingen / DE
Former [2014/41]Bregenzer, Michael , et al
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
Former [2012/06]Bregenzer, Michael , et al
Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date11006270.029.07.2011
[2012/06]
Priority number, dateDE2010103364106.08.2010         Original published format: DE102010033641
DE2010104961426.10.2010         Original published format: DE102010049614
DE20112005144U12.04.2011         Original published format: DE 202011005144 U
[2012/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2415620
Date:08.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2415620
Date:22.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/06, B60D1/30, B60D1/58
[2012/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2012/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung mit einem Sensor[2012/06]
English:Trailer coupling with a sensor[2012/06]
French:Attelage doté d'un capteur[2012/06]
Examination procedure26.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
19.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2015Fee for grant paid
12.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15158760.7  / EP2905155
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.01.2016  28.01.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/09]
01.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2005/17
24.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2005/17
15.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.07.2011
AL22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
AT29.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU29.07.2011
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MK22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
AT29.07.2016
Former [2017/49]HU29.07.2011
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
AT29.07.2016
Former [2017/38]HU29.07.2011
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
SM22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
BE31.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2017/21]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
MT22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/33]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
IE29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
GB29.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
IT22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/15]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
LU29.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/13]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/09]DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/07]DK22.04.2015
ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/50]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
IS22.08.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
HR22.04.2015
LT22.04.2015
LV22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
RS22.04.2015
NO22.07.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL22.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2342630  (BELTON TECHNOLOGICAL SERVICES [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10,11,13,15 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 16 * * figures 1a,1b * [Y] 12;
 [XP]EP2332750  (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-5,7-11,13-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0122] * * figures 1-5,13-15 *;
 [X]US3947839  (ZIGMANT FRANK) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [Y]DE102008040866  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE102010011741
OppositionDE102010033641
 DE102010049614
 DE202011005144U
 DE102009057871
 EP2332750
 DE102010010242