Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2557233

EP2557233 - Tool with hydraulic drive for civil engineering work [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.11.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABI Anlagentechnik-Baumaschinen-Industriebedarf Maschinenfabrik und Vertriebsgesellschaft mbH
Am Knückel 4
63843 Niedernberg / DE
[2013/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Heichel, Christian
Allensteiner Straße 6
63843 Niedernberg / DE
02 / Kleibl, Albrecht
Am Röhrig 9
63762 Großostheim / DE
 [2013/07]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB
Körnerstrasse 27
58095 Hagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]Dörner, Kötter & Kollegen
Körnerstrasse 27
58095 Hagen / DE
Application number, filing date11006636.212.08.2011
[2013/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2557233
Date:13.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2557233
Date:30.04.2014
Language:DE
[2014/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:E02D7/18, B06B1/16
[2013/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/07]
TitleGerman:Arbeitsgerät mit hydraulischem Antrieb für Tiefbauarbeiten[2013/07]
English:Tool with hydraulic drive for civil engineering work[2013/07]
French:Appareil de travail doté d'un entraînement hydraulique pour travaux de construction profonds[2013/07]
Examination procedure15.03.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
08.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2014Fee for grant paid
18.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.01.2015   
ThyssenKrupp Tiefbautechnik GmbH
Hollestr. 7a
45127 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus
Andrejewski - Honke
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/10]
Opponent(s)01  29.01.2015   
Thyssenkrupp Tiefbautechnik GmbH
Hollestr. 7a
45127 Essen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus
Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8
45127 Essen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition29.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0027/17
15.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.08.2011
AL30.04.2014
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
GB12.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU12.08.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MK30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
GB12.08.2015
Former [2016/34]HU12.08.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
GB12.08.2015
Former [2016/33]HU12.08.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
TR30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/32]HU12.08.2011
CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/28]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
MT30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2016/22]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
SM30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/37]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IE12.08.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/36]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SI30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/20]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/19]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
LU12.08.2014
IS30.08.2014
BE31.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/18]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
MC30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RO30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/10]CY30.04.2014
CZ30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
EE30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
SK30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/08]CY30.04.2014
DK30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2015/02]CY30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
PT01.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
RS30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY30.04.2014
ES30.04.2014
HR30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
LV30.04.2014
PL30.04.2014
SE30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
GR31.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
NO30.07.2014
IS30.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY30.04.2014
LT30.04.2014
BG30.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY30.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0951949  (INT CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT B V [NL]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2014835  (PTC [FR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2085149  (ANLAGENTECH BAUMASCH IND [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2085149
 DE202007005283U