Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2560364

EP2560364 - Driver assisting system and method for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Veoneer Sweden AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
447 83 Vårgårda / SE
[2018/37]
Former [2013/14]For all designated states
Autoliv Development AB
Wallentinsvägen 22
44783 Vårgårda / SE
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
Autoliv Development AB
Patent Department Wallentinsvägen 22
44783 Vårgårda / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Hedberg, Ognjan
Ågatan 10
58222 Linköping / SE
02 / Hammarström, Per Jonas
Lövsättersvägen 2
58337 Linköping / SE
03 / Knutsson, Per
Platensgatan, 07
58220 Linköping / SE
 [2013/13]
Former [2013/08]01 / Hedberg, Ognjan
Ågatan 10
58222 Linköping / SE
02 / Hammerström, Per Jonas
Lövsättersvägen 2
58337 Linköping / SE
03 / Knutsson, Per
Platensgatan, 07
58220 Linköping / SE
Representative(s)Müller Verweyen
Patentanwälte
Friedensallee 290
22763 Hamburg / DE
[2013/08]
Application number, filing date11006711.317.08.2011
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2560364
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225, H04N5/232
[2013/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Fahrerassistenzsystem und verfahren für ein Kraftfahrzeug[2013/08]
English:Driver assisting system and method for a motor vehicle[2013/08]
French:Système et méthode d'assistance à la conduite d'un véhicule motorisé[2013/08]
Examination procedure09.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/39]
09.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
24.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1887492  (MOBILEYE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY]) [X] 1-6,12,13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,10,11,14;
 [X]US2006177098  (STAM JOSEPH S [US]) [X] 1-9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0225] * * figures 2A,2B,24,25 *;
 [X]DE102008031861  (GOETTING JUN HANS-HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [Y]US2005104998  (UDAKA TORU [JP]) [Y] 7,8,10,11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1,4 *;
 [YA]US2009027518  (KITA KAZUNORI [JP]) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0139] * * figure 1 * [A] 1-3,8,11,12,15;
 [AD]US2010134616  (SEGER ULRICH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US6023061  (BODKIN WILLIAM ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 19 - line 34 * * column 9, line 18 - line 29 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2405548  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-6,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] * * figures 1, 3A-3D *;
 [A]US2010259628  (ROUS MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1130457  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,10,15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 4A,4B,6 *
by applicantUS2010134616