Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2559752

EP2559752 - Novel Isochrysis sp. Tahitian clone and uses therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2014  [2014/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DE RECHERCHE POUR L'EXPLOITATION DE LA MER (IFREMER)
155, rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau
92138 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
[2013/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Dubois, Nolwenn
40 rue du Général de Sonis
44000 Nantes / FR
02 / Doulin-Grouas, Sophie
945, route d'Ars
6 lotissement le Petit Montferrand
01600 Sainte Euphémie / FR
03 / Cadoret, Jean-Paul
7 Rue Prés Verts
44115 Basse Goulaine / FR
04 / Bougaran, Gaël
16, rue Amédée Ménard
44300 Nantes / FR
05 / Rouxel, Catherine
17, rue du Puisatier
Le Bois Raguenet
44700 Orvault / FR
 [2013/08]
Representative(s)Touroude, Magali Linda
Simodoro-ip
Parc Cézanne II - Bât. G
290, avenue Galilée
FR-13857 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Touroude-Barbot, Magali Linda
Simodoro-ip Parc Cézanne II - Bât. G 290, avenue Galilée
FR-13857 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR
Application number, filing date11006712.117.08.2011
[2013/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2559752
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/12, C12R1/89, C12P7/64
[2013/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Neuartiger Isochrysis sp. Tahitian-Klon und dessen Verwendungen[2013/08]
English:Novel Isochrysis sp. Tahitian clone and uses therefor[2013/08]
French:Nouveau clone d'Isochrysis sp tahitian et ses utilisations[2013/08]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure21.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/07]
26.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]  FERNANDEZ-REIRIZ M ET AL, "Effect of Microalgal Diets and Commercial Wheatgerm Flours on the Lipid Profile of Ruditapes decussatus Spat", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY. PART A, MOLECULAR AND INTEGRATIVE PHYSIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 119, no. 1, ISSN 1095-6433, (19980101), pages 369 - 377, (19980101), XP027188065 [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11
 [XI]  ALONSO D L ET AL, "Acyl lipid composition variation related to culture age and nitrogen concentration in continuous culture of the microalga Phaeodactylum tricornutum", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 54, no. 5, ISSN 0031-9422, (20000601), pages 461 - 471, (20000601), XP027253671 [X] 6-8 * abstract * * paragraph [3.2.2] * * table 6 * [I] 12-15
 [XI]  COPEMAN L A ET AL, "Effects of docosahexaenoic, eicosapentaenoic, and arachidonic acids on the early growth, survival, lipid composition and pigmentation of yellowtail flounder (Limanda ferruginea): a live food enrichment experiment", AQUACULTURE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 210, no. 1-4, ISSN 0044-8486, (20020731), pages 285 - 304, (20020731), XP027273234 [X] 6-8,13,14 * table 1 * * paragraph [02.1] * [I] 12,15
 [A]  MATA T M ET AL, "Microalgae for biodiesel production and other applications: A review", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE ENERGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIERS SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.RSER.2009.07.020, ISSN 1364-0321, (20100101), pages 217 - 232, (20090803), XP026670594 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rser.2009.07.020
 [A]  HUERLIMANN ROGER ET AL, "Growth, Lipid Content, Productivity, and Fatty Acid Composition of Tropical Microalgae for Scale-Up Production", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (201010), vol. 107, no. 2, pages 245 - 257, XP002666673 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/BIT.22809
by applicant   BOROWITZKA, JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 70, no. 1-3, pages 313 - 321,
    MORIST ET AL., PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 535 - 547,
    GUERIN ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 210 - 216,
    NADAKAVUKAREN ET AL., BOTANY. AN INTRODUCTION TO PLANT BIOLOGY, (1985), pages 324 - 325,