Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2423829

EP2423829 - Scrollable and re-sizeable formula bar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2012/09]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Brandon G.
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / Ellis, Charles D.
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2012/09]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/09]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11007779.923.03.2006
[2012/09]
Priority number, dateUS2005009694031.03.2005         Original published format: US 96940
[2012/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2423829
Date:29.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24
[2012/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Scrollbare und größenveränderbare Formelleiste[2012/09]
English:Scrollable and re-sizeable formula bar[2012/09]
French:Barre de formule déroulante et redimensionnable[2012/09]
Examination procedure23.09.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
08.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
22.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/01]
22.06.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.09.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/01]
Appeal following examination04.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2495/17
02.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
18.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06111605.9  / EP1708093
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060111605) is  23.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[T]  - "Range.Show Method", Microsoft MSDN Library, Microsoft, URL: http://msdn.microsoft.com/en-us/library/microsoft.office.interop.excel.range.show%28v=office.11%29.aspx, (20120116), XP002667273 [T] 1-10
 [T]  - "Goto Method [Excel 2003 VBA Language Reference]", Microsoft MSDN Library, Microsoft, URL: http://msdn.microsoft.com/en-us/library/aa195750%28v=office.11%29.aspx, (20120116), XP002667274 [T] 1-10