Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2461040

EP2461040 - Vacuum pump and joint of shaft and rotary piston [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, SI
published on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Aßlar / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berliner Strasse 43
35614 Aßlar / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kobus, Christopher
Industriestrasse 21E
61279 Grävenwiesbach / DE
02 / Oberbeck, Sebastian
Bismarckstrasse 1
35781 Weilburg / DE
03 / Wagner, Jürgen
Bogenstrasse 1
57629 Müschenbach / DE
 [2012/23]
Representative(s)Knefel, Cordula
Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel
Postfach 19 24
35529 Wetzlar / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2012/51]Knefel, Cordula
Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24
35529 Wetzlar / DE
Former [2012/23](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date11008599.027.10.2011
[2012/23]
Priority number, dateDE2010105131613.11.2010         Original published format: DE102010051316
[2012/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2461040
Date:06.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2461040
Date:06.01.2016
Language:DE
[2016/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:F04C29/00, F04C18/12, F04C23/00, F04C28/02
[2012/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2012/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vakuumpumpe und Verbindung von Welle und Drehkolben[2012/23]
English:Vacuum pump and joint of shaft and rotary piston[2012/23]
French:Pompe à vide et la connexion de l'arbre avec le piston rotatif[2012/23]
Examination procedure14.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2012Examination requested  [2012/52]
02.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2015Fee for grant paid
09.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
[2017/15]
Former [2016/50]CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/49]DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/46]DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/39]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/38]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/36]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
NL06.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL06.01.2016
Documents cited:Search[IY]JPH03290082  (KITAMURA SHUICHI) [I] 1,5,9-11 * abstract * * figures 1-17 * [Y] 3,4,7,9-11;
 [Y]SU724820  (ORENBOJM BORIS D [SU]) [Y] 3,4,7,9-11 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4142811  (BURNHAM J KELLOGG) [A] 1,3,8 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE3689054T
by applicantEP0368124