Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2476607

EP2476607 - Scooter for small child [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micro Mobility Systems AG
Bahnhofstrasse 10
8700 Küsnacht / CH
[2012/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Ouboter, Jan Willem Anton
Haslihalde 24
8707 Uetikon am See / CH
 [2012/29]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11009298.823.11.2011
[2012/29]
Priority number, dateDE20112001596U17.01.2011         Original published format: DE 202011001596 U
[2012/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2476607
Date:18.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2476607
Date:05.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:B62K3/00, B62J1/00, B62K9/02
[2012/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/29]
TitleGerman:Kleinkind-Roller[2012/29]
English:Scooter for small child[2012/29]
French:Trottinette pour petits enfants[2012/29]
Examination procedure12.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
08.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2013Fee for grant paid
19.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.11.2014Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pik and Roll
1 rue du Général Vandenberg
67140 Barr / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 [2017/03]
Former [2016/35]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  10.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pik and Roll
1 rue du Général Vandenberg
67140 Barr / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014   
Pik and Roll
1 rue du Général Vandenberg
67140 Barr / FR
Opponent's representative
Grand, Guillaume, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
62, Rue de Bonnel
69003 Lyon / FR
11.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
01.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.09.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition22.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2538/16
17.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.11.2011
AL05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
LU23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
[2018/46]
Former [2016/32]HU23.11.2011
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
LU23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2015/41]HU23.11.2011
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
MT05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
LU23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2015/34]HU23.11.2011
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
LU23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2015/33]CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
MK05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2015/30]CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2015/25]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
SM05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE23.11.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2014/42]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
BE30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/24]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
IT05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/21]CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/14]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
IS05.10.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
LV05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/51]FI05.06.2013
HR05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
RS05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI05.06.2013
LT05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
ES16.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT05.06.2013
NO05.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]FR2467003  (AMPAFRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,3,10,13,14 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 12; figure 1 * [I] 2,5-9,11,12;
 [XI]US4941670  (PARR DAVID A [AU]) [X] 1,4,10,13,14 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 * [I] 2,5,6,8,9,11,12
otherWO0003773