Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2599828

EP2599828 - Multimodal polyethylene composition for the production of pipes with improved slow crack growth resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.05.2014
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.06.2014  [2014/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2013/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Buryak, Andrey
Raimundstrasse 29
4020 Linz / AU
02 / Eriksson, Virginie
Strandkärr 22
44491 Stenungsund / SE
03 / Palmlöf, Magnus
Mårdgatan 23
42671 Västra Frölunda / SE
04 / Nymark, Anders
Kahdeksantoistamäenkuja 5
06100 Porvoo / FI
05 / Bäckman, Mats
"-"
deceased / SE
 [2013/23]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date11009527.001.12.2011
[2013/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2599828
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/06, C08L23/08, F16L9/12
[2013/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Multimodale Polyethylenzusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Rohren mit verbesserter Beständigkeit gegen langsames Risswachstum[2013/23]
English:Multimodal polyethylene composition for the production of pipes with improved slow crack growth resistance[2013/23]
French:Composition de polyéthylène multimodale pour la production des tuyaux avec une résistance améliorée de croissance lente des fissures[2013/23]
Examination procedure06.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/23]
17.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03085044  (MEDIA PLUS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-3; claims 1-21 *;
 [A]EP1041113  (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [A] 1-15 * example 3; claims 1-33; table 3 *;
 [AD]US6770341  (BOEHM LUDWIG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1-8; table 1 *;
 [AD]EP1460105  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [AD] 1-15 * examples 1-3; claims 1-12; tables 2,3 *
by applicantEP0739937
 EP1920179
 US6770341
 EP1460105
 US4582816
 US3405109
 US3324093
 EP0479186
 US5391654
 US3374211
 US3242150
 EP1310295
 EP0891990
 EP1415999
 EP1591460
 WO2007025640
 US4933149
 EP0684871
 WO2005087261
 US4578879
 EP0600414
 EP0721798
 US4543399
 EP0699213
 WO9425495
 EP0696293
 WO0029452
 US4621952
 EP0188125
 EP0250169
 EP0579426
 US5026795
 US4803251
 US4532311
 US4855370
 EP0560035
 EP0707513
 EP0688794
 WO0155230
 WO2006063771
 EP0428054
 WO9619503
 WO9632420
    - SCHEIRS; BOHM; BOOT; LEEVERS, "PE100 Resins for Pipe Applications", TRIP, (1996), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 408 - 415
    - GELDART; BAYENS, "The Design of Distributors for Gas-fluidised Beds", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 42
    - KLIMKE, K.; PARKINSON, M.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M., MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2006), vol. 207, page 382
    - PARKINSON, M.; KLIMKE, K.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M., MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2007), vol. 208, page 2128
    - POLLARD, M.; KLIMKE, K.; GRAF, R.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M.; SPERBER, O.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W, MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, page 813
    - FILIP, X.; TRIPON, C.; FILIP, C., J. MAG. RESN., (2005), vol. 176, page 239
    - GRIFFIN, J.M.; TRIPON, C.; SAMOSON, A.; FILIP, C.; BROWN, S.P, MAG. RES. IN CHEM., (2007), vol. 45, page S1,S198
    - CASTIGNOLLES, P.; GRAF, R.; PARKINSON, M.; WILHELM, M.; GABORIEAU, M., POLYMER, (2009), vol. 50, page 2373
    - ZHOU, Z.; KUEMMERLE, R.; QIU, X.; REDWINE, D.; CONG, R.; TAHA, A.; BAUGH, D.; WINNIFORD, B., J. MAG. RESON., (2007), vol. 187, page 225
    - BUSICO, V.; CARBONNIERE, P.; CIPULLO, R.; PELLECCHIA, R.; SEVERN, J.; TALARICO, G., MACROMOL. RAPID COMMUN., (2007), vol. 28, page 1128
    - J. RANDALL, MACROMOL. SCI., REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, page 201
    - HEINO, E.L.; LEHTINEN, A.; TANNER J.; SEPPÄLÄ, J.; NESTE OY, "Rheological characterization of polyethylene fractions", PORVOO, FINLAND, THEOR. APPL. RHEOL., PROC. INT. CONGR. RHEOL, (1992), vol. 1, pages 360 - 362
    - "Definition of terms relating to the non-ultimate mechanical properties of polymers", PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 701 - 754