Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2465987

EP2465987 - Improved spunbond polyester mat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/25]Improved nonwoven of synthetic polymer
[2014/20]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.08.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johns Manville
717 Seventeenth Street
Denver, CO 80202 / US
[2014/39]
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
Johns Manville
717 17th Street
Denver CO 80202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shooshtari, Kiarash, Alavi
9193 West Finland Drive
Littleton CO 80127 / US
02 / Hamilton, James, Patrick
34 Hunters Run
Horseheads NY 14845 / US
03 / Asrar, Jawed
9483 East Arbor Drive
Englewood CO 80111 / US
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys
European Trademark Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Mai, Dörr, Besier
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2012/25]Mai, Dörr, Besier
Patentanwälte
Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer
John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date11009802.713.12.2011
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateUS2010096915615.12.2010         Original published format: US 969156
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2465987
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2465987
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/64, C03C25/32, C08B37/00, C08L5/00, C09J179/00, D04H3/12
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
TitleGerman:Verbessertes Spunbond-Polyestervlies[2014/20]
English:Improved spunbond polyester mat[2014/20]
French:Non-tissé spunbond de polyester amélioré[2014/20]
Former [2012/25]Verbesserter Vlies aus synthetischem Polymer
Former [2012/25]Improved nonwoven of synthetic polymer
Former [2012/25]Non-tissé amélioré de polymère synthétique
Examination procedure22.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/45]
21.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2014Fee for grant paid
13.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Knauf Insulation SPRL
Rue de Maastricht, 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
ARC-IP
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/39]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2015  26.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Knauf Insulation SPRL
Rue de Maastricht, 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
ARC-IP
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui 4
1435 Mont Saint-Guibert / BE
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2015   
Knauf Insulation SPRL
Rue de Maastricht, 95
4600 Visé / BE
Opponent's representative
Farmer, Guy Dominic
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui, 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
29.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1602/17
16.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.12.2011
AL24.09.2014
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MK24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
GB13.12.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MK24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
GB13.12.2015
Former [2017/37]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
GB13.12.2015
Former [2017/04]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
GB13.12.2015
IT13.12.2015
Former [2016/47]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
GB13.12.2015
Former [2016/33]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/32]HU13.12.2011
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/31]AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/27]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/22]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/12]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
IE13.12.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU13.12.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/12]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT24.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4308089  (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * column 2, lines 13-17; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US1801053  (MEIGS JOSEPH V) [A] 1-21 * page 1, lines 16-32; claim 1 * * page 4, lines 26-44,86-92; example 10 *;
 [A]DE1905054  (DIERKS FORESTS INC) [A] 1-21 * page 3, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 4, paragraph 6; claim 1 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * * page 1, paragraph 2; claim 10 * * page 6, line 2 *;
 [A]WO2007014236  (KNAUF INSULATION GMBH [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 2, lines 9,24; claims 1-3,27 *;
 [A]EP1510607  (JOHNS MANVILLE INT INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * claim 1 *
ExaminationWO2011022222
by applicantDE2460755