Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2466882

EP2466882 - Distribution system for a telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Televés, S.A.
Rua B. de Conxo, 17, Apartado 444
15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Lopez Arca, Gumersindo
c/o Televés S.A.
Rua B. de Conxo, 17
15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES
02 / Fernandez Carnero, José Luis
c/o Televés S.A.
Rua B. de Conxo, 17
15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES
03 / Rodal Perez, Justo
c/o Televés S.A.
Rua B. de Conxo, 17
15706 Santiago de Compostela / ES
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Dosterschill, Peter
Dosterschill & Kollegen Fichtenstrasse 11
85570 Ottenhofen / DE
Application number, filing date11009939.717.12.2011
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateES2010000160520.12.2010         Original published format: ES 201001605
ES2011000002510.01.2011         Original published format: ES 201100025
[2012/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2466882
Date:20.06.2012
Language:DE
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/10, H03G3/20
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verteilungssystem für ein Telekommunikationsnetz[2012/25]
English:Distribution system for a telecommunications network[2012/25]
French:Système de répartition pour un réseau de télécommunication[2012/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
21.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
24.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.01.2015Appeal received No.  T1151/15
25.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2009047917  (PHILLIPS NEIL P [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0081] - [0089] *;
 [Y]WO2009150625  (NXP BV [NL]; VILLAIN FREDERIC FRANCOIS [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2006015921  (VAUGHAN JAY [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [Y]EP1551084  (BTICINO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3869564  (COLODNY SAMUEL H) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 9 - line 18 *;
 [A]EP2259446  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-4 *