Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2469457

EP2469457 - System and method for improved service oriented architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAP SE
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
[2014/43]
Former [2012/26]For all designated states
SAP AG
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Delchev, Ivan
c/o SAP AG
Global IP Group
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
02 / Vogel, Juergen
c/o SAP AG
Global IP Group
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
 [2012/26]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/26]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date11010010.420.12.2011
[2012/26]
Priority number, dateUS2010097605822.12.2010         Original published format: US 976058
[2012/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2469457
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/06
[2012/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verbesserung einer dienstorientierten Architektur[2012/26]
English:System and method for improved service oriented architecture[2012/26]
French:Système et procédé pour architecture orientée service améliorée[2012/26]
Examination procedure20.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
16.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.06.2014Appeal received No.  T1873/14
25.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]  - MATTHIAS WIELAND ET AL, "Towards Reference Passing in Web Service and Workflow-Based Applications", ENTERPRISE DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING CONFERENCE, 2009. EDOC '09. IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090901), ISBN 978-0-7695-3785-6, pages 109 - 118, XP031540453 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - KOULOUZIS S ET AL, "Data transport between visualization web services for medical image analysis", PROCEDIA COMPUTER SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PROCS.2010.04.194, ISSN 1877-0509, (20100501), pages 1727 - 1736, (20100501), XP027492093 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.procs.2010.04.194
 [I]  - DEAN J ET AL, "MapReduce: Simplified Data Processing on Large Clusters", vol. 51, no. 1, doi:10.1145/1327452.1327492, ISSN 0001-0782, (200801), pages 107 - 113, COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, URL: http://dl.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1327492, (20080101), XP002630192 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1327452.1327492