Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2469457 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2469457



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 333
05.09.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
02.09.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.08.2019 General enquiry Appeal 1
31.10.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.09.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
18.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.09.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 1
11.09.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
25.08.2014 Claims Appeal 6
25.08.2014 Claims Appeal 5
25.08.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
22.08.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 4
18.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
12.06.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.04.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Annex to a communication Search / examination 11
17.04.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.04.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
17.04.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
17.04.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.02.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
25.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
25.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 6
25.02.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 13
04.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.12.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
04.12.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Description Search / examination 1
11.09.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
27.08.2013 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
16.08.2013 Description Search / examination 3
16.08.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
16.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 11
16.04.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.12.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
20.12.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
20.12.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 11
20.12.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
02.07.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.06.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
31.05.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
18.05.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.05.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 5
18.05.2012 European search report Search / examination 1
20.04.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.03.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.12.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
20.12.2011 Description Search / examination 12
20.12.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 Drawings Search / examination 4
20.12.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8