Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2469457


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2014 Change - applicant published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
16.09.2014 Change: Appeal number
02.09.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
17.06.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
17.06.2014 New entry: Appeal number
16.04.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.04.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
09.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.12.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.04.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.04.2013 First examination report
11.01.2013 Request for examination filed published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
04.01.2013 Amendment by applicant
27.06.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]