Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2353445

EP2353445 - Slide for retracting parts of furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Simon GmbH & Co. KG
Sulgener Str. 19 - 23
78733 Aichhalden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/32]For all designated states
Karl Simon GmbH & Co. Kg
Sulgener Str. 19 - 23
78733 Aichhalden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bantle, Ulrich
Im Joergenbrunnen 9
72186, Empfingen / DE
 [2013/36]
Former [2011/32]01 / Bantle, Ulrich
Im Joergenbrunnen 9
72186, Empfingen / DE
Representative(s)Herrmann, Jochen , et al
Herrmann
Patentanwälte
Königstrasse 30
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Patentanwälte Jeck-Fleck-Herrmann Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Former [2011/32]Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Patentanwälte Jeck-Fleck-Herrmann Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date11151027.714.01.2011
[2011/32]
Priority number, dateDE2010100034108.02.2010         Original published format: DE102010000341
[2011/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2353445
Date:10.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2353445
Date:04.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47B88/04, E05F5/00, E05F5/02
[2011/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/32]
TitleGerman:Einzugvorrichtung für Möbel[2011/32]
English:Slide for retracting parts of furniture[2011/32]
French:Glissière pour retracter des parties de meubles[2011/32]
Examination procedure30.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/12]
12.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2013
30.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.07.2013Fee for grant paid
19.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13172385.0  / EP2647311
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB, et al
Marstallstrasse 8
80539 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/46]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB, et al
St.-Anna-Straße 15
DE-80538 München / DE
Former [2017/36]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2017/32]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014  26.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Opponent's representative
DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB, et al
St.-Anna-Strasse 15
80538 München / DE
Former [2014/28]
Opponent(s)01  04.06.2014   
Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG
Industriestrasse 83-87
32139 Spenge / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
11.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0843/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0843/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.01.2011
AL04.09.2013
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MK04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
RS04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
AT14.01.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU14.01.2011
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MK04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
RS04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
AT14.01.2016
Former [2017/36]HU14.01.2011
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
RS04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
AT14.01.2016
Former [2016/32]HU14.01.2011
BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
RS04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2016/31]BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
RS04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2016/28]BG04.09.2013
CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2016/22]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
SM04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2016/12]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
MT04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2015/48]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
GB14.01.2015
Former [2015/21]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
MC04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/08]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
BE31.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/07]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
IE14.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/51]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
DK04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
LU14.01.2014
Former [2014/28]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
PT06.01.2014
Former [2014/24]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
ES04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY04.09.2013
CZ04.09.2013
EE04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
SK04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
IS04.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
NL04.09.2013
RO04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY04.09.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY26.06.2013
FI04.09.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
LV04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
SI04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
GR05.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY26.06.2013
HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR04.09.2013
LT04.09.2013
SE04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT04.09.2013
NO04.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO04.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE20315124U  (HETTICH HEINZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,11 * figures 5-13 * [Y] 8,10;
 [X]DE20218927U  (HETTICH HEINZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * figures 1, 2, 18-21 *;
 [Y]DE20204725U  (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [Y] 8 * figures 7, 8 * * page 6, paragraph 5 *;
 [Y]DE202005004336U  (HETTICH HEINZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 10 * figures 13, 16 *
by applicantDE102007008363
 DE202004006410U
 EP1658785