Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2479684

EP2479684 - Method and evaluation server for evaluating a plurality of videos [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]For all designated states
NTT DoCoMo, Inc.
11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kellerer, Wolfgang
Stockmeierweg 2
82256, Fürstenfeldbruck / DE
02 / Munaretto, Daniele
Agnes-Bernauerstr. 71 C/C Cejkova
80687, Munich / DE
03 / Thakolsri, Srisakul
Joergstrasse 27
80689, Munich / DE
04 / Steinbach, Eckehard
Neufeldstr. 50
82140, Olching / DE
05 / El Essaili, Ali
Schellingstr. 88
80798, Munich / DE
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]Betten & Resch
Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date11151663.921.01.2011
[2012/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2479684
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2479684
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/30]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Beurteilungsserver zur Beurteilung mehrerer Videos[2012/30]
English:Method and evaluation server for evaluating a plurality of videos[2012/30]
French:Procédé et serveur d'évaluation pour évaluer une pluralité de vidéos[2012/30]
Examination procedure13.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/34]
16.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2013Fee for grant paid
12.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2012
Opposition(s)26.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.01.2011
AL25.09.2013
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MK25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
TR25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU21.01.2011
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MK25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
TR25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/33]HU21.01.2011
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
TR25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/32]HU21.01.2011
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/28]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/22]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
SM25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/12]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
MT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/21]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/07]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE21.01.2014
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/51]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
FR31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
LU21.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/26]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/23]BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/12]FI25.09.2013
HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RS25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT25.09.2013
NO25.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO25.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009087161  (ROBERTS DALE T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0065]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0212]; figure 4 *;
 [I]US2009148124  (ATHSANI ATHELLINA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0055] , [0081] - [0086] - [0091] , [0093]; figures 2,4 *;
 [I]US2010002084  (HATTORI YUKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0095] , [0097] , [0101] - [0112] * * paragraphs [0119] , [0127] , [0128] , [0131]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2006103151  (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 31-38 * * page 5, line 29 - line 37 * * page 9, line 20 - line 37 *;
 [A]US2010214419  (KAHEEL AYMAN MALEK [EG], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0022] - [0027] - [0041] - [0044]; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO2009005744  (ALLVOICES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] *;
 [A]GB2456129  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 26; figure 1 *
by applicantUS5675576
    - B. RADUNOVIC; J. Y. LE BOUDEC, "A unified framework for maxmin and min-max fairness with applications", IEEE/ACM TRANS. ON NETWORKING, (200710), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1083
    - J. HUANG; V. G. SUBRAMANIAN; R. AGRAWAL; R. BERRY, "Joint scheduling and resource allocation in uplink OFDM systems for broadband wireless access network", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (200902), vol. 27, no. 2
    - Z. WANG, L. LU; A. C. BOVIK, "Video Quality Assessment Based on Structural Distortion Measurement", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING: IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (200402), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 121 - 132
    - T. C. THANG; Y. J. JUNG; M. M. RO, "Semantic quality for content-aware video adaptation", PROC. IEEE WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING (MMSP), (200510), pages 41 - 44