Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2357598

EP2357598 - Systems and methods for enhanced transaction processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shakkarwar, Rajesh
21353 Vai Ave
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2011/33]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2011/33]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/33]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date11151775.122.01.2011
[2011/33]
Priority number, dateUS20100297642P22.01.2010         Original published format: US 297642 P
US20111301181621.01.2011         Original published format: US201113011816
[2013/13]
Former [2011/33]US20100297642P22.01.2010
US2011001181621.01.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2357598
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2357598
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/00
[2011/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Systeme und Verfahren zur erweiterten Transaktionsverarbeitung[2011/33]
English:Systems and methods for enhanced transaction processing[2011/33]
French:Systèmes et procédés pour le traitement amélioré des transactions[2011/33]
Examination procedure23.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
20.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2013
03.12.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2013
19.12.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination03.04.2014Appeal received No.  T1489/14
03.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002169720  (WILSON PHILLIP C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8-12 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0066] * [I] 5-7;
 [XI]EP1962238  (BIGG INTERNAT INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0033] * * figure 1 * [I] 5-8;
 [I]US2004249753  (BLINN ARNOLD NEIL [US] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0063] *;
 [I]WO2009137716  (VERIENT INC [US]; SHAKKARWAR RAJESH G [US]) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *