Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2361756

EP2361756 - Tire vulcanizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.)
10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-8585 / JP
[2011/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Fujieda, Yasuhiko
c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd.
3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8670 / JP
02 / Shibata, Masaharu
c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd.
3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8670 / JP
 [2011/35]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2011/35]
Application number, filing date11151960.925.01.2011
[2011/35]
Priority number, dateJP2010003339018.02.2010         Original published format: JP 2010033390
[2011/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2361756
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2361756
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/06, B29C33/20
[2011/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/35]
TitleGerman:Reifenvulkanisiervorrichtung[2011/35]
English:Tire vulcanizer[2011/35]
French:Vulcanisateur de pneus[2011/35]
Examination procedure25.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/35]
21.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2014Fee for grant paid
11.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015  30.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Harburg-Freudenberger Maschinenbau GmbH
Seevestrasse 1
D-21079 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Klickow & Wetzel PartGmbB, et al
Jessenstraße 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015  30.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Harburg-Freudenberger Maschinenbau GmbH
Seevestrasse 1
D-21079 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Klickow & Partner Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB, et al
Jessenstraße 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
29.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2015Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
16.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0456/17
17.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.01.2011
AL23.07.2014
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU25.01.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MK23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2017/38]HU25.01.2011
AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
SM23.07.2014
TR23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2017/03]AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
MT23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/32]AT23.07.2014
BE23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/07]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
SI23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/48]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
GB25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
MC23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/39]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
CZ23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
EE23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
DK23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
IT23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RO23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT23.07.2014
CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
HR23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
LV23.07.2014
NL23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
RS23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
IS23.11.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY23.07.2014
ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
PL23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
GR24.10.2014
PT24.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES23.07.2014
FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
BG23.10.2014
NO23.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI23.07.2014
LT23.07.2014
SE23.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT23.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE1938905  (BRUNOTTE & NIEMEYER MASCHINENF) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 15; figures 1-3,7 * * page 6, line 17 - line 27; figure 4 * [Y] 7;
 [X]DE19817822  (THYSSEN KRUPP AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 36; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4453902  (IMBERT JEAN-MAURICE [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 24 - column 12, line 21; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US2006267248  (COLE JOHN R [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-4 *;
 [YA]US4105379  (GAZUIT GEORGES) [Y] 7 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 29; figure 1 * [A] 1-6;
 [A]US4533304  (AMANO ITARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5238394  (HIRATA HISAKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 52; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2002086088  (ROMI ROMEU [BR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-7 *
by applicantJPH0370610
OppositionDE19817822
 US4453902
 US5238394
 US2006267248
 DE1938905
 US4105379
 US4533304
 US2002086088
 US2008057151
 US4804318