Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2308933

EP2308933 - Ink set, ink container, inkjet recording method, recording device, and recorded matter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2011/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Oyanagi, Takashi
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
02 / Takemoto, Kiyohiko
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
03 / Nakazawa, Chiyoshige
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2014/34]
Former [2011/15]01 / Oyanagi, Takashi
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
02 / Takemoto, Kiyohiko
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
03 / Nakazawa, Chiyoshige
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/15]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date11152368.428.01.2008
[2011/15]
Priority number, dateJP2007001727629.01.2007         Original published format: JP 2007017276
JP2007026380109.10.2007         Original published format: JP 2007263801
[2011/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2308933
Date:13.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2308933
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[2011/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2011/15]
TitleGerman:Tintensatz, Tintenbehälter, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren, Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung und aufgezeichnetes Material[2011/15]
English:Ink set, ink container, inkjet recording method, recording device, and recorded matter[2011/15]
French:Assortiment d'encre, réservoir d'encre, procédé d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, dispositif d'enregistrement, et matériau imprimé[2011/15]
Examination procedure27.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/15]
13.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2014Fee for grant paid
25.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08001510.0  / EP1950260
Divisional application(s)EP11177753.8  / EP2390291
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080001510) is  14.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.05.2015   
ECKART GmbH
Güntersthal 4
91235 Hartenstein / DE
Opponent's representative
Walcher, Armin, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [2015/26]
24.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0099/17
20.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5453121  (NICHOLLS STEPHEN L [AU], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, lines 33-58 *;
 [Y]WO2006101054  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * claim - *;
 EP1862511  [ ] (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0024] , [0056] *;
 [Y]GB1547283  (MALLINCKRODT INC) [Y] 1 * page 6, lines 41-49; claim 2 *;
 [Y]JPH11343436
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 12, Database accession no. 2000-129322, XP002476905 & JPH11343436 A 19991214 (OIKE KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *
by applicantJP2002179960
 JP2003292836
 JP2003306625
 JP2005068250