Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2308933


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.11.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2018 Change: Appeal number
25.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.01.2017 Change: Appeal number
11.01.2017 New entry: Appeal number
11.01.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
07.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
19.04.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
12.01.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
23.06.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
22.05.2015 Opposition filed published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
18.07.2014 (Expected) grant published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
11.07.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.07.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.06.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.03.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.10.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.06.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.01.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.12.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.08.2012 First examination report
27.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.01.2012 Change - divisional application(s) published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
13.10.2011 Amendment by applicant
19.08.2011 Change - divisional application(s) published on  21.09.2011  [2011/38]
11.03.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
11.03.2011 Request for examination filed published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
01.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid