Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2308933

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted20.08.2014
Opposition procedure08.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
Appeal following opposition09.01.2017APPEAL FILED
20.03.2017APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20110127
 
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1950260
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:13.04.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:12.09.2012 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20120814
 
Event date:02.04.2014 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20140307
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1950260
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:02.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602008034046 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20141002
 
Event date:20.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602008034046 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:24.06.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ECKART GMBH
Effective DATE:20150520
 
Event date:08.12.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:15.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:11.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20181213
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190115
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190123
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190121
Year of Fee Payment:12