Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2364646

EP2364646 - Hearing test method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
[2018/08]
Former [2015/46]For all designated states
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
28 Ayer Rajah Crescent
06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Former [2011/37]For all designated states
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Inventor(s)01 / Chalupper, Josef
Schlucklbergstr. 20
85307, Paunzhausen / DE
02 / Krämer, Beate Anna Maria
Beethovenstr. 38
90768, Fürth / DE
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/37]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date11154032.410.02.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateDE2010101076409.03.2010         Original published format: DE102010010764
[2011/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2364646
Date:14.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2364646
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/12, H04R25/00
[2011/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/37]
TitleGerman:Hörtestverfahren[2011/37]
English:Hearing test method[2011/37]
French:Procédé de test auditif[2011/37]
Examination procedure21.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
24.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2012Fee for grant paid
06.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
GN Hearing A/S / Oticon A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7 / Kongebakken 9
2750 Ballerup / 2765 Smørum / DK
Opponent's representative
Aera A/S, et al
Gammel Kongevej 60, 18th floor
1850 Frederiksberg C / DK
 [2019/18]
Former [2019/17]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
GN Hearing A/S / Oticon A/S
Lautrupbjerg 7 / Kongebakken 9
2750 Ballerup / 2765 Smørum / DK
Opponent's representative
Nordic Patent Service A/S, et al
Bredgade 30
1260 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2015/50]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Widex A/S / Oticon A/S / GN ReSound A/S
Nymøllevej 6 / Kongebakken 9 / Lautrupbjerg 7
3540 Lynge / 2765 Smørum / 2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Nordic Patent Service A/S, et al
Bredgade 30
1260 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2013  04.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Widex A/S / Oticon A/S / GN ReSound A/S
Nymøllevej 6 / Kongebakken 9 / Lautrupbjerg 7
3540 Lynge / 2765 Smørum / 2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Nordic Patent Service A/S, et al
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [2013/31]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2013   
Oticon A/S / Widex A/S / GN Resound A/S
Kongebakken 9 / Nymoellevej 6 / Lautrupbjerg 9
2765 Smoerum / 3540 Lynge / 2750 Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Nordic Patent Service A/S, et al
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.11.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.04.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1396/15
24.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.02.2011
AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
MK26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
SM26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
LU10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
AT10.02.2016
[2017/36]
Former [2015/34]HU10.02.2011
AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
MK26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
SM26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
LU10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2015/32]AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
MK26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
SM26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2015/24]AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
SM26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
MT26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/09]AL26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
IE10.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/06]CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
BE28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/52]CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/46]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
ES06.01.2013
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/37]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
IT26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/34]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/32]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
RS26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/28]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
Former [2013/22]CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
IS26.01.2013
Former [2013/12]FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
SE26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/11]FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
LV26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/10]FI26.09.2012
HR26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI26.09.2012
LT26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
Former [2013/08]LT26.09.2012
NO26.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2004049125  (NAKAMURA NORIO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0096] *;
 [XY]  - STECKER G C ET AL, "Perceptual training improves syllable identification in new and experienced hearing aid users", JOURNAL OF REHABILITATION RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT 2006 REHABILITATION RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT SERVICE USA, (2006), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1682/JRRD.2005.11.0171, pages 537 - 551, XP002630692 [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1682/JRRD.2005.11.0171
 [Y]  - FULLGRABE C ET AL, "Masking release for consonant features in temporally fluctuating background noise", HEARING RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 211, no. 1-2, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.HEARES.2005.09.001, ISSN 0378-5955, (20060101), pages 74 - 84, (20060101), XP025083407 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.heares.2005.09.001
 [Y]  - RICKETTS T ET AL, "Comparison of performance across three directional hearing aids.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF AUDIOLOGY APR 1999 LNKD- PUBMED:10941709, (199904), vol. 10, no. 4, ISSN 1050-0545, pages 180 - 189, XP002630693 [Y] 7 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1813190
    - CHRISTIAN LORENZI; GAETAN GILBERT; HELOISE CARN; STEPHANE GARNIER; BRIAN C. J. MOORE, "Speech perception problems of the hearing impaired reflect inability to use temporal fine structure", PNAS, (20061205), vol. 103, no. 49, page 18869