blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2361602 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2361602



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 209
11.02.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
11.02.2011 Drawings Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Description Search / examination 10
11.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
16.02.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 20
04.03.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.07.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.08.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
28.11.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
25.02.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
25.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.07.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.08.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
03.01.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 53
13.01.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 54
13.01.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.01.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
07.04.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1