Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2361602 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2361602



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 209
01.10.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.04.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
13.01.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
13.01.2014 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 54
03.01.2014 Observations by third parties Search / examination 53
19.08.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.08.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
29.07.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
25.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.02.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
25.02.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
25.02.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
25.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.11.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
27.08.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.07.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
13.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
13.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.07.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Priority document Search / examination 20
16.02.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Description Search / examination 10
11.02.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2011 Drawings Search / examination 2
11.02.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4