blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2361602
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2011195039Global Dossier 11.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB201002254 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2361602Global Dossier 22.08.2012A3
EP2361602 31.08.2011A2
Priority number Date
GB201002254 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2477913 24.08.2011A
GB201002254D 31.03.2010D0
Priority number Date
GB201002254 11.02.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2478043 24.08.2011A
GB201102479D 30.03.2011D0
Priority number Date
GB201002254 11.02.2010