Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2361602

EP2361602 - A hair building solid agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pangaea Laboratories Limited
58 Crewys Road
London NW2 2AD / GB
[2011/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Isaacs, Elliot
Pangaea Laboratories Ltd
58 Crewys Road
London, NW2 2AD / GB
 [2011/35]
Representative(s)Handsome I.P. Ltd
27-28 Monmouth Street
Bath BA1 2AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Handsome I.P. Ltd
3 Chapel Row
Queen Square
Bath, BA1 1HN / GB
Former [2011/35]Hands, Lewis Roger
Handsome I.P. Ltd 3 Chapel Row
Bath, North East Somerset BA1 1HN / GB
Application number, filing date11154255.111.02.2011
[2011/35]
Priority number, dateGB2010000225411.02.2010         Original published format: GB 201002254
[2012/19]
Former [2011/35]GB2010000225411.02.2010
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2361602
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2361602
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/04, A61Q5/00, A61K8/44, A61K8/49, A61Q5/12, A61K8/02
[2012/34]
Former International [2011/35]A61K8/04, A61Q5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Festes Haaraufbauwirkstoff[2011/35]
English:A hair building solid agent[2011/35]
French:Composé solide de consolidation des cheveux[2011/35]
Examination procedure04.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/11]
25.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2014Observations by third parties
21.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/45]
29.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
05.08.2013Request for further processing filed
05.08.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.08.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008135979  (ZABARI EREZ [IL]) [X] 1,2,7,10,13,14 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 17 - line 28 * * claim - * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]US2008223879  (BATINKOFF RANDALL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7,10,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 15 - paragraph 17 * * page 2, paragraph 42 - paragraph 44 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]US2004076649  (BLIN XAVIER [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 10 * * page 1, paragraph 12 - paragraph 16 * * page 4, paragraph 62 - paragraph 63 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XP]US7691398  (ARAI TAKESHI [JP] ET AL) [XP] 1-12,14,15 * column 2, line 20 - line 45 * * column 12, line 24 - line 37 * * example - *;
 [Y]US4243659  (BALINGIT ANGELINA T ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 31 * * example - *
other   - "ZIMAAD BARA-E-DAA-US-SA,ALAB", TKDL, Database accession no. JA3/233J, XP003033412
    - ZIYA AL-DIN ABDULLAH AL-BAITAR, DIN AL-JAAM'E-LI MUFRADAAT AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, (1874), vol. II, page 165
    - "NISADI LEPA", TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/3858B, XP003033413
    - VANGASENA, VANGASENA, (1996), page 868
    - "TILA-E-DAMAGHTUL KARM", TKDL, Database accession no. FA1/116M4, XP003033414
    - MOHAMMAD AZAN KHAN, MUHEET-E-AZAM, (1899), vol. IV, page 63
    - "YASTAYADILEPAH", TKDL, Database accession no. RS/840, XP003027292
    - BHARATA BHAISAJYA RATNAKARA, (1999), vol. IV, page 309
    - "KESAPATE HARIDRADILEPA", TKDL, Database accession no. RS1/1056, XP003033415
    - VAGBHATTAH, RASARATNASAMUCCAYAH, (1962), page 417
    - "ARUSIKAHARA YOGA", TKDL, Database accession no. RS23/1627C, XP003033416
    - VAGABHATA, ASTANGA HRDAYA, (1998), page 862
    - "NUSKHA-E-TAHLUB", TKDL, Database accession no. JA7/106, XP003033417
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, MUHEET-E-AZAM MATBA NIZAMI, (1887), vol. II, page 71
    - "KHALITYA PALITYA HAR TAILA", TKDL, Database accession no. RS14/428, XP003033418
    - KALI DASA, VAIDYAMANORAMA, (2005), page 102
    - "CHAI", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/324, XP003025063
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, KHAZAAIN-AL-ADVIA, (1911), vol. II, page 343
    - "TILA BARAAE ASAAR-E-QUROOH", TKDL, Database accession no. AH3/1415A, XP003033419
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, KAAMIL-AL-SENA'AH, (2005), page 198, II
    - "TUFFAAH", TKDL, Database accession no. AH1/130, XP003025381
    - ABU ALI IBN SINA, AL-QAANOON-FIL TIBB, (1987), vol. II, page 100
    - "INDRALUPTAHARA LEPA-01", TKDL, Database accession no. AK9/1024B, XP003033420
    - CUDAMANI, RASAKAMADHENU SAMHITA, (1992), page 331