Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2489720

EP2489720 - Renewable oil with low iron content and its use in hydrotreatment process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.08.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neste Oil Oyj
Keilaranta 21
02150 Espoo / FI
[2012/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Ouni, Tuomas
Pihlajatie 31 A 1
00270 Helsinki / FI
02 / Sippola, Väinö
Mankkaanpuro 13M
02180 Espoo / FI
03 / Lindqvist, Petri
Ritarikaari 21
06100 Porvoo / FI
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2014/42]
Former [2014/29]Struve, Casper
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2013/24]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Antinkatu 3 C
00101 Helsinki / FI
Former [2012/34]Knuth-Lehtola, Sisko Hillevi , et al
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date11154437.515.02.2011
[2012/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2489720
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C10G3/00, C10G1/00, A23D9/013, C11C3/12
[2012/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verwendung von erneuerbarem Öl in einem Wasserstoffbehandlungsverfahren[2012/34]
English:Renewable oil with low iron content and its use in hydrotreatment process[2012/34]
French:Utilisation d'huile renouvelable dans un procédé d'hydrotraitement[2012/34]
Examination procedure15.02.2011Examination requested  [2012/34]
18.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination22.03.2016Appeal received No.  T2151/16
07.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP18211051.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2937647  (TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING [FR]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 3, lines 4-24 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 16 * * page 8, lines 14-26 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 5 * * page 11, lines 7-8 * * figure 1 * * example 2 * * tables 2,7 * * claims 1-3,5,7-8,10 *;
 [X]US2010038284  (VERGEL CESAR [FR]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0027] , [0029] , [0031] , [0056] - [0057] - [0059] - [0064] - [0073] - [0074] - [0077] - [0078] * * table 2 * * example 2 * * paragraphs [0124] , [0128] * * claims 1,2,5-6,12-13 *;
 [X]WO2007003709  (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7 * page 1, lines 11-15 * * page 2, lines 14-31 * * page 3, lines 11-19, 28-35 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 32 * * page 8, lines 5-7 * * page 9, lines 7-20 * * page 12, line 7 - page 14, line 24 * * page 15, lines 7-14 * * page 16, lines 8-22 * * page 17, lines 18-25 * * table 4 * * example 7 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2003050492  (COPELAND DICK [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0005] - [0007] - [0008] - [0051] , [0076] , [0108] - [0109] - [0123] * * table 1 * * example 1 *
by applicantEP1396531
 US2007010682
 EP0507217