Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2489528

EP2489528 - Anti slip device for a wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.01.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
König IP AB
Box 69
330 33 Hillerstorp / SE
[2016/26]
Former [2012/34]For all designated states
Thule Sweden AB
Box 69
330 33 Hillerstorp / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Arrigoni Neri, Marco
c/o Thule S.p.A.
23847, Molteno / IT
02 / Farina, Luigi
c/o Thule S.p.A.
23847, Molteno / IT
03 / Necchi, Stefano
c/o Thule S.p.A.
23847, Molteno / IT
 [2012/34]
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2015/32]Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
Former [2012/34]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date11154659.416.02.2011
[2012/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2489528
Date:22.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2489528
Date:05.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:B60C27/10, B60C27/06
[2015/11]
Former International [2012/34]B60C27/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2012/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Antirutschvorrichtung für ein Rad[2012/34]
English:Anti slip device for a wheel[2012/34]
French:Dispositif anti-dérapage pour roue[2012/34]
Examination procedure03.09.2012Examination requested  [2012/41]
20.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
15.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2015Fee for grant paid
22.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.05.2016  11.05.2016  ADMISSIBLE
RUD Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH & Co
Friedensinsel
73432 Aalen-Unterkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2016/24]
13.06.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0725/18
16.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.02.2011
AL05.08.2015
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
BG05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/47]HU16.02.2011
AL05.08.2015
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
BG05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/38]HU16.02.2011
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
BG05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU16.02.2011
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU16.02.2011
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
MT05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
TR05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU16.02.2011
AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CY05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MK05.08.2015
MT05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
SM05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
Former [2017/47]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
MT05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
Former [2017/08]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
GB16.02.2016
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
IE16.02.2016
LU16.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT05.08.2015
BE05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
LU16.02.2016
Former [2016/43]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
LU16.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
MC05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SI05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RO05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
SK05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/22]AT05.08.2015
CZ05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
EE05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/20]AT05.08.2015
DK05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/14]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NL05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT05.08.2015
ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES05.08.2015
FI05.08.2015
HR05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
PL05.08.2015
RS05.08.2015
SE05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
IS05.12.2015
PT07.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI05.08.2015
LT05.08.2015
LV05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
GR06.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT05.08.2015
NO05.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT05.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1331109  (PEWAG AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,4-9,13,17-20 * columns 80-84 * * columns 57-60; figures 1-3; claim - * [Y] 3;
 [Y]CH677215  (ALFRED BECK) [Y] 3 * column 2; figure 2; claim - *;
 [A]WO9725216  (PIRSIC JURIJ [SI]) [A] 1,2,4,10,12,14,17,18 * page 4 - page 6; figure -; claim - *
by applicantEP0438999
OppositionEP0438999
 EP0292315
 DE202004010579U
 EP0594909
 DE3636313
 AT467U
 EP1331109
    - Merkmalsanalyse