Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2399558

EP2399558 - Disposable diapers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter and Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2011/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Rinnert, Torsten
Gießener Strasse 17
35463, Fernwald / DE
02 / Schneider, Manuela
Annastraße 16
64625, Bensheim / DE
03 / Reichardt, Nicole Anja
Hauptstrasse 53A
65843, Sulzbach / DE
04 / Kruse, Bettina
c/o Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824, Schwalbach / DE
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/52]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date11155400.222.02.2011
[2011/52]
Priority number, dateEP2010016733325.06.2010         Original published format: EP 10167333
[2011/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2399558
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2399558
Date:19.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F13/511, A61F13/84, A61F13/514
[2012/31]
Former International [2011/52]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
TitleGerman:Saugfähige Artikel[2011/52]
English:Disposable diapers[2011/52]
French:Articles absorbants[2011/52]
Examination procedure01.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/29]
13.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2012Fee for grant paid
07.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.09.2013  24.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/27]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2013  24.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2013/43]
Opponent(s)01  19.09.2013   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
24.10.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0044/16
16.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.02.2011
AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
LU22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
FR02.03.2015
[2016/12]
Former [2015/34]HU22.02.2011
AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
LU22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/32]AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MK19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
TR19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/24]AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
SM19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/32]AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
MT19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/09]AL19.12.2012
AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/07]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
IE22.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2014/03]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
IT19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/52]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CY19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/48]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
DK19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/42]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/40]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
PT19.04.2013
Former [2013/37]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
NL19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RO19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/36]AT19.12.2012
BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
PL19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/35]BE19.12.2012
CZ19.12.2012
EE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
SK19.12.2012
BG19.03.2013
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
IS19.04.2013
Former [2013/33]BE19.12.2012
FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/32]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
RS19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/26]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
SI19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
GR20.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI19.12.2012
HR19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
LV19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI19.12.2012
LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
ES30.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT19.12.2012
SE19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Former [2013/20]LT19.12.2012
NO19.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1295711  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 1,2,7,12 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * page 4, paragraphs 25-27 * * page 5, paragraphs 33,34,37,38 * * page 7, paragraphs 54,59 * * page 8, paragraph 62 * * page 12, paragraph 100 *;
 [A]EP1306069  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, paragraphs 14,15 * * page 6, paragraph 49 *;
 [A]EP1327427  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-28 *;
 [A]EP1779874  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3003388
 WO2007047598
 EP1447067
 US3860003
 US4808178
 US4695278
 US4795454
    - R.S. HUNTER, "photoelectric color difference Meter", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (1958), vol. 48, pages 985 - 95