blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2336617

EP2336617 - Modular Valve System and its use in a method for producing chemical and pharmaceutical products with integrated multi-column chromatography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/25]Method for producing chemical and pharmaceutical products with integrated multi-column chromatography
[2013/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
[2012/44]
Former [2011/25]For all designated states
Bayer Technology Services GmbH
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Strube, Jochen
Letterhausstr. 22
58099, Hagen / DE
02 / Klatt, Karsten-Ulrich
Kolumbusring 1
53175, Bonn / DE
03 / Noeth, Gerhard
Deceased
Deceased / DE
04 / Greifenberg, Joern
Overather Str. 10
51429, Bergisch Gladbach / DE
05 / Böcker, Sebastian
Erdbeerweg 1
42799, Leichlingen / DE
06 / Kansy, Heinz
Thymianweg 13
Köln, 51061 / DE
07 / Jähn, Peter
Kirnbergwiese 6
82393, Isseldorf / DE
08 / Justen, Berthold
Am Sieferbusch 82
51399, Burscheid / DE
 [2011/44]
Former [2011/25]01 / Strube, Jochen
Letterhausstr. 22
58099, Hagen / DE
02 / Klatt, Karsten-Ulrich
Kolumbusring 1
53175, Bonn / DE
03 / Noeth, Gerhard
Weinbergstr. 108
50823, Köln / DE
04 / Greifenberg, Joern
Overather Str. 10
51429, Bergisch Gladbach / DE
05 / Böcker, Sebastian
Erdbeerweg 1
42799, Leichlingen / DE
06 / Kansy, Heinz
Thymianweg 13
Köln, 51061 / DE
07 / Jähn, Peter
Kirnbergwiese 6
82393, Isseldorf / DE
08 / Justen, Berthold
Am Sieferbusch 82
51399, Burscheid / DE
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [N/P]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
DE-40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2013/01]BIP Patents
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2012/44]Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date11155542.114.05.2005
[2011/25]
Priority number, dateDE2004102500021.05.2004         Original published format: DE102004025000
[2011/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2336617
Date:22.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2336617
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2336617
Date:26.02.2014
Language:DE
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:B01D15/08, G01N30/42
[2012/37]
CPC:
F16K27/003 (EP,US); B01D15/1842 (EP,NO,US); F16B11/00 (EP,US);
F16D1/068 (EP,US); F16D3/387 (EP,US); G01N30/42 (EP,NO,US);
F16D2001/062 (EP,US); Y10T137/7062 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2011/25]F16K27/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/25]
TitleGerman:Modulare Ventiltechnik und seine Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von chemischen und pharmazeutischen Produkten mit integrierter Mehrsäulen-Chromatographie[2013/41]
English:Modular Valve System and its use in a method for producing chemical and pharmaceutical products with integrated multi-column chromatography[2013/41]
French:Système de vanne modulaire et son utilisation dans un procédé de fabrication de produits chimiques et pharmaceutiques dotés d'une chromatographie à plusieurs colonnes intégrée[2013/41]
Former [2011/25]Verfahren zur Herstellung von chemischen und pharmazeutischen Produkten mit integrierter Mehrsäulen-Chromatographie
Former [2011/25]Method for producing chemical and pharmaceutical products with integrated multi-column chromatography
Former [2011/25]Procédé de fabrication de produits chimiques et pharmaceutiques dotés d'une chromatographie à plusieurs colonnes intégrée
Examination procedure08.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
16.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2014Fee for grant paid
07.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05742674.4  / EP1753517
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050742674) is  03.09.2009
Opposition(s)27.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.05.2005
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
AT14.05.2014
LU14.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU14.05.2005
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
AT14.05.2014
LU14.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/28]BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
AT14.05.2014
LU14.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/25]BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
AT14.05.2014
LU14.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/38]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
AT14.05.2014
LU14.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU14.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU14.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/04]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU14.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US6386508  (STEIL FRED [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [AD]WO03052308  (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,3 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3268605
 US3706612
 US4434051
 US4499115
 WO9113046
 WO9216274
 WO9304022
 EP0688590
 EP0688589
 EP0688588
 EP0688690
 US5685992
 US5762806
 DE19833502
 EP0960642
 WO0025885
 EP0688589
 EP0688588
 WO03052308
    - JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1992), vol. 590, pages 113 - 117
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.