Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2374483

EP2374483 - Cleaning and odorisation agent for sanitary use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Buck-Chemie GmbH .
Hertzstrasse 1
71083 Herrenberg / DE
[2011/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Leipold, Joachim, Dr.
Memelstraße 37
72760 Reutlingen / DE
02 / Fritz, Matthias
Hegelweg 5
72810 Gomaringen / DE
03 / Jaeschke, Edgar
Ludwig-Richter-Weg 14
70794 Filderstadt / DE
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)Mammel, Ulrike
Mammel & Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Strasse 3
71065 Sindelfingen / DE
[2011/41]
Application number, filing date11156537.002.03.2011
[2011/41]
Priority number, dateDE2010101330429.03.2010         Original published format: DE102010013304
[2011/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2374483
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2374483
Date:26.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2374483
Date:20.02.2013
Language:DE
[2013/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61L9/05, C11D17/00, C11D3/50
[2011/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/41]
TitleGerman:Reinigungs- und Beduftungsmittel für den Sanitärbereich[2011/41]
English:Cleaning and odorisation agent for sanitary use[2011/41]
French:Moyen de nettoyage et d'aération pour le domaine sanitaire[2011/41]
Examination procedure28.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/14]
26.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2012Fee for grant paid
21.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.11.2013   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2013/52]
15.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0673/16
27.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
19.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.11.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2011
AL20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MK20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
SM20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
AT02.03.2016
[2017/45]
Former [2015/34]HU02.03.2011
AL20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MK20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
SM20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
LU02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/32]AL20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MK20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
SM20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/30]AL20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
SM20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/24]AL20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
SM20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AL20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2014/32]AL20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/09]AL20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/08]CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
BE31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/07]CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
IE02.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
NL20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/47]FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/43]FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RS20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/41]FI20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/38]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]FI20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/36]LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.02.2013
SE20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.02.2013
NO20.05.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0058433  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1-3, 5 *;
 [Y]DE20221220U  (BUCK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 51]; claims 1-18 *;
 [Y]EP1469132  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0089] *;
 [A]EP1051477  (RECKITT BENCKISER FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,7-10 * example 6; claims 1-12 *
by applicantDE19710635
 EP1418225
 EP1553162
 US6268466
 EP1553162