Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2380981

EP2380981 - Coenzyme-linked glucose dehydrogenase and polynucleotide encoding the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ikeda Food Research Co. Ltd.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
[2011/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Omura, Hironori
c/o IKEDA FOOD RESEARCH CO., LTD.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
02 / Sanada, Hirokazu
c/o IKEDA FOOD RESEARCH CO., LTD.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
03 / Yada, Takako
c/o IKEDA FOOD RESEARCH CO., LTD.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
04 / Atsumi, Ayaka
1-31-2-102, Matsushiro, Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki 305-0035 / JP
05 / Morita, Tetsunari
c/o IKEDA FOOD RESEARCH CO., LTD.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
06 / Ishimaru, Emi
c/o IKEDA FOOD RESEARCH CO., LTD.
95-7, Minooki-cho Fukuyama-shi
Hiroshima 721-0956 / JP
 [2011/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11156664.227.03.2006
[2011/43]
Priority number, dateJP2005008988425.03.2005         Original published format: JP 2005089884
[2011/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2380981
Date:26.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/09, C12M1/00, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N9/04, C12Q1/32
[2011/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2011/43]
TitleGerman:Coenzym-verknüpfte Glucose-Dehydrogenase und dafür codierendes Polynucleotid[2011/43]
English:Coenzyme-linked glucose dehydrogenase and polynucleotide encoding the same[2011/43]
French:Glucose deshydrogénase liée à une co-enzyme et polynucléotide codant pour cell-ci[2011/43]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure02.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/43]
26.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/40]
14.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/40]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06730146.5  / EP1862543
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060730146) is  05.03.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
02.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2004058958  (IKEDA FOOD RES CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-19 * claims 9,20,21 * [A] 6;
 EP1584675  [ ] (IKEDA FOOD RES CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0992589  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9820136  (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 3 *;
 [AD]  - YOSHIDA H ET AL, "CONSTRUCTION OF MULTI-CHIMERIC PYRROLOQUINOLINE QUINONE GLUCOSE DEHYDROGENASE WITH IMPROVED ENZYMATIC PROPERTIES AND APPLICATION IN GLUCOSE MONITORING", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, KEW, SURREY, GB, (20000901), vol. 22, no. 18, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 1505 - 1510, XP009017135 [AD] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005658316948
 [AD]  - BAK T-G, "STUDIES ON GLUCOSE DEHYDROGENASE OF ASPERGILLUS ORYZAE. II. PURIFICATION AND PHYSICAL AND CHEMICAL PROPERTIES", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, (19670101), vol. 139, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 277 - 293, XP009067679 [AD] 1-19 * abstract *
 [A]  - BAK T G, "Studies on glucose dehydrogenase of Aspergillus oryzae. 3. General enzymatic properties", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, NL, (19670101), vol. 146, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1016/0005-2744(67)90218-5, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 317 - 327, XP002373580 [A] 1-19 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2744(67)90218-5
 [XA]  - KOJIMA S ET AL, "Fundamental study for an oxygen-insensitive amperometric glucose sensor using a novel glucose dehydrogenase", CHEMICAL SENSORS, XX, JP, (20040711), vol. 20, no. SUPPLEMENT B, pages 768 - 769, XP003004574 [X] 1-5,7-19 * the whole document * [A] 6
by applicantWO2004058958
 JP2000312588
 JP2000350588
 JP2000354495
 JP2001197888
 JP2001346587
 JP2001037483
 JP2004173538
 JP2004313172
 JP2004313180
 JP2004344145
 JPH10243786
 JP2004512047
 WO02072839
 JPS5925700
 US4458066
 US6100037
 JP2002526759
    - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1967), vol. 242, pages 3665 - 3672
    - APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 56, pages 301 - 310
    - ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (1998), vol. 22, pages 269 - 274
    - ARCH. MICROBIOL., (1997), vol. 167, pages 119 - 125
    - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 51, pages 58 - 64
    - ARCH. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 176, pages 178 - 186
    - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1967), vol. 139, pages 277 - 293
    - APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 64, no. 4, pages 1405 - 1411
    - BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 62, no. 10, pages 1938 - 1946
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (198310), vol. 80, pages 6286 - 6288
    - CARRUTHERS, Symp. Quant. Biol., COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1982), vol. 47, pages 411 - 418
    - ADAMS, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1983), vol. 105, page 661
    - BELOUSOV, NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3440 - 3444
    - FRENKEL, FREE RADIC. BIOL. MED., (1995), vol. 19, pages 373 - 380
    - BLOMMERS, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, pages 7886 - 7896
    - NARANG, METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 90
    - BROWN, METH. ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, page 109
    - BEAUCAGE, TETRA. LETT., (1981), vol. 22, page 1859
    - MERRIFIELD, R.B., "J. Solid phase peptide synthesis I. The synthesis of tetrapeptide", J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1963), vol. 85, pages 2149 - 2154
    - SPATOLA, Chemistry and Biochemistry of Amino Acids, Peptides and Proteins, MARCELL DEKKER, (1983), vol. 7, pages 267 - 357
    - BIOSCI. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 61, no. 8, pages 1367 - 1369
    - TOSHITAKA MINETOKI, CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 38, no. 12, pages 831 - 838
    - SAKE, MASAYA GOMI, JOURNAL OF THE BREWING SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2000), pages 494 - 502
    - Laboratory Manual for Gene Expression, Production of useful protein in high expression system, KODANSYA SCIENTIFIC LTD., (1994), pages 100 - 129
    - HIROYA YURIMOTO; YASUYOSHI SAKAI, CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 38, no. 8, pages 533 - 540
    - LAEMMLI ET AL., NATURE, (1970), vol. 227, pages 680 - 685