Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2371418

EP2371418 - Electrical feedthrough, in particular for medical implants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
[2011/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Teske, Josef
Adolf-Wächter-Strasse 3
96103, Hallstadt / DE
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Galander, Marcus , et al
Biotronik Corporate Services SE
Corporate Intellectual Property
Sieversufer 7 - 9
12359 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Lindner-Vogt, Karin L.
Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date11156793.903.03.2011
[2011/40]
Priority number, dateUS20100318405P29.03.2010         Original published format: US 318405 P
[2011/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2371418
Date:05.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2371418
Date:24.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/375
[2011/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrische Durchführung insbesondere für medizinische Implantate[2011/40]
English:Electrical feedthrough, in particular for medical implants[2011/40]
French:Conduite électrique, notamment pour implants médicaux[2011/40]
Examination procedure23.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/14]
17.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
25.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2002027484  (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] , [0 62] - [0067]; figure - * [Y] 14;
 [YA]WO03073450  (GREATBATCH SIERRA INC [US]) [Y] 14 * page 23, line 9 - page 24, line 20; figure - * [A] 1-13;
 [IA]US2007112398  (STEVENSON ROBERT A [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0217] * * paragraph [0259] - paragraph [0260]; figure - * [A] 14;
 [IDA]US5870272  (SEIFRIED LYNN M [US], et al) [ID] 1-13 * column 6, line 53 - column 11, line 4; figure - * [A] 14;
 [A]US6414835  (WOLF WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, lines 31-47 * * column 11, line 58 - column 12, line 4; figure - *
by applicantUS5870272