Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2365444

EP2365444 - Dma engine capable of concurrent data manipulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSI Corporation
1621 Barber Lane
M/S D-105 Legal
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
[2015/19]
Former [2011/37]For all designated states
Lsi Corporation
1621 Barber Lane M/S D-105 Legal
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Piccirillo, Gary
14407 Laumar Court
Cypress, TX 77429 / US
02 / Olson, David M.
146 Summer Storm Place
The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[2014/44]
Former [2011/37]Williams, David John
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London
WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date11157074.304.03.2011
[2011/37]
Priority number, dateUS2010071827905.03.2010         Original published format: US 718279
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2365444
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2365444
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/28
[2011/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2011/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DMA-Maschine mit Fähigkeit zur gleichzeitigen Datenmanipulation[2011/37]
English:Dma engine capable of concurrent data manipulation[2011/37]
French:Moteur DMS capable de traiter des données concurrentes[2011/37]
Examination procedure13.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/16]
24.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
29.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2014
13.11.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2015Fee for grant paid
06.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.09.2013
Opposition(s)09.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
29.05.2012Request for further processing filed
29.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.03.2011
AL06.05.2015
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU04.03.2011
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2018/29]HU04.03.2011
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2018/28]HU04.03.2011
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2017/40]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/49]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2009248910  (CONROY DAVID G [US] ET AL) [I] 1-4,6-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [00 9] , [0 41] , [0 42] , [0 46] , [0 50] * [Y] 5,14;
 [Y]WO9917212  (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) [Y] 5,14 * the whole document *;
 [XP]US7716389  (BRUCE REY [US] ET AL) [XP] 1-3,6-11,13,15 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5652796