Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2345657

EP2345657 - Modified fluorinated nucleoside analogues [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2017  [2017/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[2012/50]
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
Gilead Pharmasset LLC
303A College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08450 / US
Former [2011/29]For all designated states
Pharmasset, Inc.
303A College Road East
Princeton, NJ 08450 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clark, Jeremy
2883 Quinbery Drive
Snellville, GA 30039 / US
 [2011/29]
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2012/13]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2011/31]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2011/29]Portal, Frédéric , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date11157832.421.04.2004
[2011/29]
Priority number, dateUS20030474368P30.05.2003         Original published format: US 474368 P
[2011/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2345657
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/06, C07H19/10, A61K31/7068, A61P31/14
[2011/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/29]
Extension statesHR11.01.2012
LT11.01.2012
LV11.01.2012
TitleGerman:Modifizierte fluorinierte Nukleosidanaloga[2011/29]
English:Modified fluorinated nucleoside analogues[2011/29]
French:Analogues de nucléosides fluores modifiés[2011/29]
Examination procedure11.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/29]
11.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2012Observations by third parties
22.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
30.04.2013Observations by third parties
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2013Observations by third parties
07.04.2014Observations by third parties
09.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2015Observations by third parties
23.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/20]
05.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/20]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04775900.6  / EP1633766
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040775900) is  24.01.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.03.2016Request for further processing filed
23.03.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.04.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.08.2013Request for further processing filed
20.08.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.09.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0190121  (NOVIRIO PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [KY], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantWO9712033
 US5980884
 US5942223
 US5928636
 US5849696
 US5830455
 US5738845
 US5676942
 US5372808
 US5747646
 US5792834
 US5834594
 WO9932139
 WO9932140
 WO9513090
 US5738846
 US5711944
 US5908621
 US3798209
 USRE29835E
 WO9959621
 WO0037110
 WO0181359
 WO0232414
 WO03024461
 WO9915194
 WO9964016
 WO0024355
 WO0192282
 WO9822496
 DE19914474
 WO9817679
 WO9907734
 US6004933
 US5990276
 US5538865
 WO0208251
 WO0208187
 WO0208256
 US6534523
 US6410531
 US6420380
 WO02060926
 WO0248172
 WO0208198
 WO0248157
 WO0248116
 US5633358
 WO9736554
 JPH08268890
 JPH10101591
 US6043077
 US5869253
 US5610054
 WO0190121
 WO2004002422
 WO2004002999
 WO0132153
 WO0160315
 WO02057425
 WO02057287
 WO0218404
 WO0179246
 WO0232920
 WO0248165
 WO2004007512
 WO2004009020
 WO03105770
 WO9943691
 US6348587
 US6034134
 US5922757
 US5846964
 US5830905
 US5633388
 US5496546
 US5026687
 US5891874
 US5837257
 US5725859
 US6056961
 WO0009531
 WO0196353
 US4957924
 US5149794
 US5194654
 US5223263
 US5256641
 US5411947
 US5463092
 US5543389
 US5543390
 US5543391
 US5554728
 WO8902733
 WO9000555
 WO9116920
 WO9118914
 WO9300910
 WO9426273
 WO9615132
 EP0350287
 WO9119721
 US5157027
 EP0180276
    - K. ISHI ET AL., "Expression of Hepatitis C Virus NS5B Protein: Characterization of Its RNA Polymerase Activity and RNA Binding", HEPTOLOGY, (1999), vol. 29, pages 1227 - 1235,
    - V. LOHMANN ET AL., "Biochemical and Kinetic Analysis of NS5B RNA-Dependent RNA Polymerase of the Hepatitis C Virus", VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 249, pages 108 - 118,
    - CALISHER ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL, (1993), vol. 70, pages 37 - 43,
    - Fields Virology, LIPPINCOTT-RAVEN PUBLISHERS, pages 931 - 959,
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., REV. INFECT. DIS., (1984), vol. 6, pages 251 - 264,
    - HALSTEAD, S. B., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 476 - 481,
    - MONATH, T. P., NEW ENG. J. MED, (1988), vol. 319, no. 64, pages 1 - 643,
    - MOENNIG, V. ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98,
    - MEYERS, G; THIEL, H.J., ADVANCES IN VIRUS RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 47, pages 53 - 118,
    - MOENNIG V ET AL., ADV. VIR. RES., (1992), vol. 41, pages 53 - 98,
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 333, page 22,
    - BAZAN; FLETTERICK, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 171, pages 637 - 639,
    - GORBALENYA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 3889 - 3897,
    - KOONIN, E.V.; DOLJA, V.V., CRIR. REV. BIOCHEM. MOLEC. BIOL., (1993), vol. 28, pages 375 - 430,
    - WISKERCHEN; COLLETT, VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 184, pages 341 - 350,
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 3835 - 3844,
    - ECKART ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1993), vol. 192, pages 399 - 406,
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 2832 - 2843,
    - GRAKOUI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 10583 - 10587,
    - HIJIKATA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4665 - 4675,
    - TOME ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4017 - 4026,
    - BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 5045 - 5055,
    - FAILLA ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 3753 - 3760,
    - XU ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 53 12 - 5322,
    - KIM ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1995), vol. 215, pages 160 - 166,
    - JIN; PETERSON, ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1995), vol. 323, pages 47 - 53,
    - WARRENER; COLLETT, J. VIROL., (1995), vol. 69, pages 1720 - 1726,
    - BEHRENS ET AL., EMBO, (1996), vol. 15, pages 12 - 22,
    - LECHMANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1997), vol. 71, pages 8416 - 8428,
    - YUAN ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1997), vol. 232, pages 231 - 235,
    - ZHONG ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 9365 - 9369,
    - GARY L. DAVIS, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 18, pages S104 - S114,
    - The Merck Index, MERCK & CO., INC., page 1304,
    - GARY L. DAVIS, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2000), vol. 118, pages 5104 - 51 14,
    - STUYVER ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 77, pages 10689 - 10694,
    - BATTAGLIA, A.M. ET AL., ANN. PHARNIACOTHER., (2000), vol. 34, pages 487 - 494,
    - BERENGUER, M. ET AL., ANTIVIR. THER., (1998), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 125 - 136,
    - BYMOCK ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY & CHEMOTHERAPY, (2000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 79 - 95,
    - DE FRANCESCO ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 58, pages 1 - 16,
    - KRONKE ET AL., J. VIRAL., (2004), vol. 78, pages 3436 - 3446,
    - ATTWOOD ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 259 - 273,
    - SUDO K. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 238, pages 643 - 647,
    - SUDO K. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1998), vol. 9, page 186,
    - CHU M. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 3, no. 7, pages 7229 - 7232,
    - CHU M. ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, vol. 9, pages 1949 - 1952,
    - QASIM M.A. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 1598 - I607,
    - SUDO K. ET AL., ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 32, pages 9 - 18,
    - KAKIUCHI N. ET AL., J. EBS LETTERS, vol. 421, pages 217 - 220,
    - TAKESHITA N. ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 247, pages 242 - 246,
    - CHU M. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, pages 7229 - 7232,
    - FERRARI R. ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 73, pages 1649 - 1654,
    - LOHMANN V. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 249, pages 108 - 118,
    - ALT M. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1995), vol. 22, pages 707 - 717,
    - ALT M. ET AL., ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 142, pages 589 - 599,
    - GALDERISI U. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 181, pages 251 - 257,
    - MACCJAK, D. J. ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (1999), page 30,
    - ELDRUP ET AL., "Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae", 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (20030427),
    - BHAT ET AL., "Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae", 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (20030427), page A75,
    - OLSEN ET AL., "Oral Session V, Hepatitis C Virus, Flaviviridae", 16TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (20030427), page A76,
    - T.W. GREENE; P.G.M. WUTS, Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS,
    - MARCH, J., Advances in Organic Chemistry: Reactions, Mechanisms, and Structure, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, page 14,
    - R. JONES; N. BISCHOFBERGER, ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 27, pages 1 - 17,
    - KUCERA, L.S.; N. IYER; E. LEAKE; A. RABEN; MODEST E.K., D.L.W.; C. PIANTADOSI; 1990, "Novel membrane-interactive ether lipid analogs that inhibit infectious HIV-1 production and induce defective virus formation", AIDS RES. HUM. RETRO VIRUSES, vol. 6, pages 491 - 501,
    - PIANTADOSI, C., J.; MARASCO C.J.; S.L. MORRIS-NATSCHKE; K.L. MEYER; F. GUMUS; J.R. SURLES; K.S. ISHAQ; L.S. KUCERA; N. IYER; C.A., "Synthesis and evaluation of novel ether lipid nucleoside conjugates for anti-HIV activity", J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, pages 1408 - 1414,
    - HOSTELLER, K.Y.; D.D. RICHMAN; D.A. CARSON; L.M. STUHMILLER; G.M. T. VAN WIJK; H. VAN DEN BOSCH, "Greatly enhanced inhibition of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 replication in CEM and HT4-6C cells by 3'-deoxythymidine diphosphate dimyristoylglycerol, a lipid prodrug of 3'-deoxythymidine", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1992), vol. 36, pages 2025 - 2029,
    - HOSETLER, K.Y.; L.M. STUHMILLER; H.B. LENTING; H. VAN DEN BOSCH; D.D. RICHMAN, "Synthesis and antiretroviral activity of phospholipid analogs of azidothymidine and other antiviral nucleosides", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, page 61127,
    - R. JONES; N. BISEHOFERGER, ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 27, pages 1 - 17,
    - KUCERA, L.S.; N. IYER; E. LEAKE; A. RABEN; MODEST E.K., D.L.W.; C. PIANTADOSI, "Novel membrane-interactive ether lipid analogs that inhibit infectious HIV-1 production and induce defective virus formation", AIDS RES. HUM. RETRO VIRUSES, (1990), vol. 6, pages 491 - 501,
    - PIANTADOSI, C.; J. MARASCO C.J.; S.L. MORRIS-NATSCHKE; K.L. MEYER; F. GUMUS; J.R. SURLES; K.S. ISHAQ; L.S. KUCERA; N. LYER; CA. WA, "Synthesis and evaluation of novel ether lipid nucleoside conjugates for anti-HIV activity", J. MED CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, pages 1408 - 1414,
    - HOSTELLER, K.Y.; D.D. RICHMAN; D.A. CARSON; L.M. STUHMILLER; G.M. T. VAN WIJK; H. VAN DEN BOSCH, "Greatly enhanced inhibition of human immunodeficiency virus type 1 replication in CEM and HT4-6C cells by 3'-deoxythymine diphosphate dimyristoylglycerol, a lipid prodrug of 3,- deoxythymine", ANTLNZICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (1992), vol. 36, pages 2025 - 2029,
    - DELAMBERT ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, page 498,
    - KHANINEI; TORRENCE, J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 4109 - 4115,
    - MITCHELL ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1992), vol. I, page 2345,
    - HUNSTON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1984), vol. 27, pages 440 - 444,
    - STARRETT ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 1857 - 1864,
    - MEIER ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, pages 811 - 815,
    - MEIER ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1997), vol. 7, pages 99 - 104,
    - FARQUHAR ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1983), vol. 26, page 1153,
    - FARQUHAR ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1985), vol. 28, page 1358,
    - FREED ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 38, page 3193,
    - ZON, PROGRESS IN MED. CHEM., (1982), vol. 19, page 1205,
    - NIFANTYEV ET AL., PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR SILICON AND RELATED EELEMENTS, (1996), vol. 113, page 1,
    - KRYUCHKOV ET AL., IZY. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, SER. KHIM., (1987), vol. 6, page 1244,
    - SHILI ET AL., BULL. INST. CHEM. ACAD. SIN, (1994), vol. 41, page 9,
    - EDMUNDSON ET AL., J. CHEM. RES. SYNOP., (1989), vol. 5, page 122,
    - NEIDLEIN ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1993), vol. 35, page 1185,
    - SOMMADOSSI J-P; CARLISLE R., "Toxicity of 3'-azido-3'-deoxythymidine and 9-(1.3-dihydroxy-2-propoxymethyl)guanine for normal human hematopoietic progenitor cells in vitro", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1987), vol. 31, pages 452 - 454,
    - SOMMADOSSI J-P; SCHINAZI RF; CHU CK; XIE M-Y., "Comparison of cytotoxicity of the (-)- and (+)-enantiomer of 2',3'-dideoxy-3'-thiacytidine in normal human bone marrow progenitor cells", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1992), vol. 44, pages 1921 - 1925,
    - RNeasy 96 handbook, pages 22 - 23,
    - STUYVER ET AL., "Ribonucleoside analogue that blocks replication of bovine viral diarrhea and hepatitis C viruses in culture", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (2003), vol. 47, pages 244 - 254,
 WO2000CA01316
 WO2001CA00197
 WO2002US00153
 WO2002US03086
 EP19930917054
otherWO2004002999