Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2497648

EP2497648 - Mechanical writing instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guenat SA Montres Valgine
Rue du Jura 11
2345 Les Breuleux / CH
[2013/36]
Former [2012/37]For all designated states
Garinaud, Frédéric
Les Barrières 14
2340 Le Noirmont / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Garinaud, Frédéric
Les Barrières 14
2340 Le Normont / CH
 [2013/36]
Former [2012/37]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Richard, François-Régis
e-Patent S.A. Rue Saint-Honoré, 1 Case postale 2510
2001 Neuchâtel / CH
[2012/37]
Application number, filing date11157949.611.03.2011
[2012/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2497648
Date:12.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2497648
Date:27.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:B43K7/00, B43K8/00, B43K5/00, B43K8/24, B43K7/12, B43K21/00, B43K21/02, B43K5/16, B43K24/00
[2014/14]
Former International [2012/37]B43K21/02, B43K24/00, A45D40/10, B43K5/16, B43K7/12, B43K8/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
TitleGerman:Mechanisches Schreibinstrument[2012/37]
English:Mechanical writing instrument[2012/37]
French:Instrument d'écriture mécanique[2012/37]
Examination procedure12.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/16]
04.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2014Fee for grant paid
18.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2013
Opposition(s)28.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201404   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.03.2011
AL27.08.2014
AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MK27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB11.03.2015
IE11.03.2015
LU11.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU11.03.2011
AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MK27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB11.03.2015
IE11.03.2015
LU11.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU11.03.2011
AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB11.03.2015
IE11.03.2015
LU11.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB11.03.2015
IE11.03.2015
LU11.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
GB11.03.2015
IE11.03.2015
LU11.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU11.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
LU11.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/24]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
RS27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE1457465  (SPATZ CORP [US]) [I] 1,5-8,10,11 * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 56; figures 10-18 * [Y] 2-4,12,13;
 [Y]US2010322696  (LIU YU-YIN [TW]) [Y] 2,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6609846  (LAI KUI-CHEUNG [HK], et al) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7097375
 FR2693953