Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2333775

EP2333775 - Write-once read-many information recording medium, information recording method, information reproduction method, information recording apparatus, and information reproduction apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.03.2015  [2015/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Yoshihisa
c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / Ito, Motoshi
c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2011/24]Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique
Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date11159373.715.12.2003
[2011/24]
Priority number, dateJP2002037353225.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002373532
JP2003027684318.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003276843
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2333775
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2333775
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/18, G11B20/12
[2014/12]
Former International [2011/24]G11B20/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   HU,   NL [2011/24]
TitleGerman:Einmal beschreibbares und mehrmals lesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium und Verfahren und Gerät zur Informationsaufzeichnung und -wiedergabe[2011/24]
English:Write-once read-many information recording medium, information recording method, information reproduction method, information recording apparatus, and information reproduction apparatus[2011/24]
French:Support d'enrégistrement de données à écriture unique et lecture multiple et procédé et appareil d'enrégistrement et de reproduction de données[2011/24]
Examination procedure31.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
20.09.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/13]
31.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/13]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03778935.1  / EP1576603
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030778935) is  23.11.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
30.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201412   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002136134  (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0152] *;
 [IP]WO03030173  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [IP] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - line 30 * * page 2, line 31 - line 32 * * page 3, line 21 - line 28 *;
 [A]EP0645031  (UNISYS CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 51 - page 4, line 39 * * page 4, line 46 - page 5, line 17 *
 [A]  - ECMA, "ECMA 260 Data interchange on 356mm oprical disk cartridges - WORM, using phase-change technology capacity: 14.8 and 25 Gbytes per cartridge", (199706), pages 77 - 82, ECMA-INTERNATIONAL.ORG, URL: http://www.ecma-international.org, (20040713), XP002289009 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ECMA, "ECMA 238 Data interchange on 130mm optical disks of type WORM using irreversible effects - capacity 2,6 Gbytes per cartridge", (199606), pages 54 - 61, ECMA-INTERNATIONAL.ORG, URL: http://www.ecma-international.org, (20040713), XP002289010 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH056626