Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2363114

EP2363114 - Sustained release of antiinfectives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.02.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Insmed Incorporated
10 Finderne Ave, Building 10
Bridgewater NJ 08807-3365 / US
[2015/21]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Insmed Incorporated
Princeton Corporate Plaza
9 Deer Park Drive, Suite C
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
Former [2011/36]For all designated states
Transave, Inc.
Princeton Corporate Plaza 11 Deer Park Drive Suite 117
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Boni, Lawrence T
40 Cummings Road
Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US
02 / Miller, Brian S.
20 Guilford Lane
Mercerville, NJ 08619 / US
 [2011/36]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Stephen, Robert John , et al
Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2011/36]Lee, Nicholas John
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date11159754.829.10.2003
[2011/36]
Priority number, dateUS20020421923P29.10.2002         Original published format: US 421923 P
[2011/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2363114
Date:07.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2363114
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/127, A61K31/7036, A61P11/00
[2011/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2011/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verzoegerte Freisetzung von Anti-infektionsmitteln[2011/36]
English:Sustained release of antiinfectives[2011/36]
French:Libération prolongée d'anti-infectieux[2015/01]
Former [2011/36]Liberation prolongée d'anti-infectieux
Examination procedure07.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/16]
16.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
19.02.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2015Fee for grant paid
31.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03816990.0  / EP1581236
Divisional application(s)EP14183066.1  / EP2823820
EP18176134.7  / EP3427742
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030816990) is  24.04.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.02.2016  26.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2018/51]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2016  26.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2016   
Generics [UK] Limited
Station Close
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1TL / GB
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
30.03.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.02.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition22.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0778/18
14.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
31.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.04.2013Request for further processing filed
29.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.05.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.03.2012Request for further processing filed
16.03.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU29.10.2015
[2016/26]
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5958449  (HERSCH EVAN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-9 * * column 6, paragraph 2 * * example 1 *;
 [Y]WO8804573  (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,4,7,11,44-47,56 * * page 12, paragraphs 2-3 * * page 26, paragraph 2 *;
 [Y]US4952405  (YAU-YOUNG ANNIE [US]) [Y] 1-9 * example 1 *;
 [Y]US5820848  (BONI LAWRENCE T [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,13,18,19 * * column 12, lines 35-48 * * examples 10,17 *;
 [Y]WO9930686  (INEX PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [CA], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1,4,15,22,32 * * page 3, lines 22-25 *;
 [YP]WO03075890  (TRANSAVE INC [US]) [YP] 1-9 * claims 1,3,4,7,8,46-53 * * page 8, paragraphs 3,5 * * example 1 *
ExaminationWO03075889
    - WICHERT B V ET AL, "Amikacin liposomes: characterization, aerosolization, and in vitro activity against Mycobacterium avium-intracellulare in alveolar macrophages", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 78, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(92)90375-C, ISSN 0378-5173, (19920101), pages 227 - 235, (19920101), XP025557898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(92)90375-C
    - SCHREIER H ET AL, "Pulmonary delivery of amikacin liposomes and acute liposome toxicity in the sheep", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 87, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(92)90242-T, ISSN 0378-5173, (19921110), pages 183 - 193, (19921110), XP025793923

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(92)90242-T
by applicantUS4522803
 US5030453
 US5169637
 US4588578
 US4975282
 US4235871
 US5008050
 US5059421
 US4515736
 US4721612
 US5041278
    - GOODMAN, GIHNAN, The Pharmaceutical Basis of Therapeutics,
    - B JANOFF ET AL., PROC. NAT ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 6122 - 6126
    - CULLIS ET AL., BIOTECHNOL ADV., (1987), vol. 5, no. 1, page 194
    - J. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 238 - 52
    - PAPHADJOPOULOS ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1967), vol. 135, pages 624 - 638
    - CHAPMAN ET AL., LIPOSOME TECHNOL., (1984), pages 1 - 18
    - BANGHAM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1965), vol. 13, pages 238 - 252
    - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., IOCHIM. BIOPHYS, ACTA., (1967), vol. 135, pages 624 - 638
    - SZOKA, JR. ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467
    - VELDHUIZEN, R., NAG, K., ORGEIG, S., POSSMAYER, F., "The Role of Lipids in Pulmonary Surfactant", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1408, pages 90 - 108
    - HAGWOOD, S., DERRICK, M., POULAIN, F., "Structure and Properties of Surfactant Protein B", BIOCHIN. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1408, pages 150 - 160
    - JOHANSSON, J., "Structure and Properties of Surfactant ProteinC", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1408, pages 161 - 172
    - IKEGAMI, M., JOBE, A.H., "Surfactant Protein Metabolism in vivo", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1998), vol. 1408, pages 218 - 225
    - COUVEUR, P., FATTEL, E., ANDREMONT,A., "Liposomes and Nanoparticles in the Treatment of Intracellular Bacterial Infections", PHARM RES, (1991), vol. 8, pages 1079 - 1085
    - GONZALES-ROTHI, R.J., CASACE, J., STRAUB, L., SCHREIER, H., "Liposomes and Pulmonary Alveolar Macrophages: Functional and Morphologic Interactions", EXP. LUNG RES., (1991), vol. 17, pages 685 - 705
    - SWENSON, C.E., PILKIEWICZ, F.G., CYNAMON, M.H., "Liposomal Aminoglycosides and TLC-65", AIDS PATIENT CARE, (199112), pages 290 - 296
    - COSTERTON, J.W., STEWART, P.S., GREENBERG, E.P., "Bacterial Biofilms: A Common Cause of Persistent Infections", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 1318 - 1322
    - CASH, H.A., WOODS, D.E., MCCULLOUGH, W.G., JOHANSON, J.R., BASS, J.A., "A Rat Model of Chronic Respiratory Infection with Pseudomonas aeruginosa", AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASE, (1979), vol. 119, pages 453 - 459
    - CANTIN, A.M., WOODS, D.E., "Aemsolized Prolastin Suppresses Bacterial Proliferation in a Model of Chronic Pseudomonas aeruginosa Lung Infection", AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (1999), vol. 160, pages 1130 - 1135
    - RAMSEY, B.W., DORKIN, H.L., EISENBERG, J.D., GIBSON, R.L., HARWOOD, I.R., KRAVITZ, P.M., "Efficacy of Aerosolized Tobramycin in Patients with cystic Fibrosis", NEW ENGLAND J. OF MED., (1993), vol. 328, pages 1740 - 1746
    - MENDEIMAN, P.M., SMITH, A.L., LEVY, J., WEBER, A., RAMSEY, B., DAVIS, R.L., "Aminoglycoside Penetration, Inactivation, and Efficacy in Cystic Fibrosis Sputum", AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASE, (1985), vol. 132, pages 761 - 765
    - PRICE, K.E., DEFURIA, M.D., PURSIANO, T.A., "Amikacin, an aminoglycoside with marked activity against antibiotic-resistant clinical isolates", J INFECT DIS, (1976), vol. 134, pages 249 - 261
    - DAMASO, D., MORENO-LOPEZ, M., MARTINEZ-BELTRAN, J., GARCIA-IGLESIAS, M.C., "Susceptibility of current clinical isolates of Pseudomonas aeruginosa and enteric gram-negative bacilli to Amikacin and other aminoglycoside antibiotics", J INFECT DIS, (1976), vol. 134, pages 394 - 90
    - PILE, J.C., MALONE, J.D., EITZEN, E.M., FRIEDLANDER, A.M., "Anthrax as a potential biological warfare agent", ARCH. INTERN. MED., (1998), vol. 158, pages 429 - 434
    - GLEISER, C.A., BERDJIS, C.C., HARTMAN, H.A., GLOUCHENOUR, W.S., "Pathology of experimental respiratory anthrax in Macaca mulatta", BRIT. J. EXP. PATH., (1968), vol. 44, pages 416 - 426
 US20030634144
 US20030383173
 US20030383004
 WO2003US06847
OppositionUS5958449
 WO8804573
 US4592405
 WO9930686
 WO03075890
 WO03075889
 US5820848
    - WICHERT B V et al., "Amikacin liposomes: characterization, aerosolization, and in vitro activity against Mycobacterium avium-intracellulare in alveolar macrophages", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19920100), vol. 78, no. 1-3, pages 227 - 235, XP025557898

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(92)90375-C
    - SCHREIER H et al., "Pulmonary delivery of amikacin liposomes and acute liposome toxicity in the sheep", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19921010), vol. 87, no. 1-3, pages 183 - 193, XP025793923

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(92)90242-T
    - BLASER et al., "Once Daily Dosing of Aminoglycosides", Eur. CLin. Microbiol. Infect. Dis, (19951200), vol. 14, no. 12, pages 1029 - 1038, XP055261104