blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2375173

EP2375173 - Extracting device and odour filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]For all designated states
MAHLE International GmbH
Pragstrasse 26-46
70376 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Renz, Birgit
Goethestrasse 48
71672, Marbach / DE
 [2011/41]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]BRP Renaud & Partner
Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date11159947.828.03.2011
[2011/41]
Priority number, dateDE2010101405907.04.2010         Original published format: DE102010014059
[2011/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2375173
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2011
ClassificationIPC:F24C15/20, B08B15/02, B01D46/52, B01D46/00
[2011/41]
CPC:
B01D46/0036 (EP); B01D46/525 (EP); B08B15/02 (EP);
F24C15/2035 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Abzugseinrichtung und Geruchsfilter[2011/41]
English:Extracting device and odour filter[2011/41]
French:Dispositif d'évacuation de vapeur et filtre à odeurs[2011/41]
Examination procedure03.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/20]
20.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/52]
12.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201909   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]DE1801668  (UNITED CARR INC) [I] 1-3,5,6 * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph l; figure - *;
 [X]US2006101999  (STEINS OLIVER [DE]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012]; figure - *;
 [A]DE102006032477  (RENTSCHLER REVEN LUEFTUNGSSYST [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9402192  (DAR SPA [IT], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE202009017271U  (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23]; figure - *
by applicantDE202007012934U
 DE29908791U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.