Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2377536

EP2377536 - Methods of Using Sustained Release Aminopyridine Compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
420 Saw Mill River Road
Ardsley, NY 10502 / US
[2012/51]
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
Acorda Therapeutics, Inc.
15 Skyline Drive
Hawthorne NY 10531 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blight, Andrew R.
10 Oskar Drive
Mahopac, NY 10541 / US
02 / Cohen, Ron
246 Harriman Road
Irvington. NY 10533 / US
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date11160247.011.04.2005
[2011/42]
Priority number, dateUS2004056089409.04.2004         Original published format: US 560894
US2005010255908.04.2005         Original published format: US 102559
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2377536
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2377536
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/44
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/42]
Extension statesAL25.10.2011
BA25.10.2011
HR25.10.2011
LV25.10.2011
MK25.10.2011
YU25.10.2011
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verwendung von Aminopyridinzusammensetzugnen mit verzögerter Freisetzung[2011/42]
English:Methods of Using Sustained Release Aminopyridine Compositions[2011/42]
French:Procédés d'utilisation de compositions d'aminopyridine à libération prolongée[2011/42]
Examination procedure24.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2011Examination requested  [2011/48]
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2012Date of oral proceedings
14.09.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2012Fee for grant paid
02.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05732613.4  / EP1732548
Divisional application(s)EP11179067.1  / EP2460521
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  16.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  06.12.2013  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 03  06.12.2013  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Neuer Wall 80
20354 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  16.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  06.12.2013  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 03  06.12.2013  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Neuer Wall 80
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  16.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Patents Department
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  06.12.2013   
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 03  06.12.2013   
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Neuer Wall 80
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  16.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Cooke, Richard Spencer, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 02  06.12.2013   
Synthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 03  06.12.2013   
neuraxpharm Arzneimittel GmbH
Elisabeth-Selbert-Str. 23
40764 Langenfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Königer, Karsten, et al
Harmsen Utescher
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Neuer Wall 80
D-20354 Hamburg / DE
29.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition24.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0799/16
16.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
11.09.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]IE82916  (ELAN CORP PLC) [X] 1-22 * claim 1 *
 [X]  - BEVER C T, "THE CURRENT STATUS OF STUDIES OF AMINOPYRIDINES IN PATIENTS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, BOSTON, US, (19940101), vol. 36, ISSN 0364-5134, pages S118 - S121, XP000653261 [X] 1-22 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410360728
 [X]  - BEVER C T JR ET AL, "The effects of 4-aminopyridine in multiple sclerosis patients: Results of a randomized, placebo-controlled, double-blind, concentration-controlled, crossover trial", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19940601), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 1054 - 1059, XP009115521 [X] 1-22 * see "Treatment" *
 [X]  - SCHWID S R ET AL, "Quantitative assessment of sustained-release 4-aminopyridine for symptomatic treatment of multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (19970401), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 817 - 821, XP009115522 [X] 1-22 * see "Procedure". *
 [X]  - VAN DIEMEN H A M ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF 4 AMINOPYRIDINE ON CLINICAL SIGNS IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS A RANDOMIZED PLACEBO-CONTROLLED DOUBLE-BLIND CROSS-OVER STUDY", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, (1992), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0364-5134, pages 123 - 130, XP002524401 [X] 1-22 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410320203
Examination   - GOODMAN ANDREW D ET AL, "Placebo-controlled double-blinded dose ranging study of fampridine-SR in multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20030311), vol. 60, no. 5 Supplement 1, ISSN 0028-3878, page A167, XP009154279
by applicantUS2004008101
 US5952357
    - BLIGHT, A.R., "Axonal physiology of chronic spinal cord injury in the cat: intracellular recording in vitro", NEUROSCIENCE, (1983), vol. 10, pages 1471 - 1486
    - BLIGHT, A.R., "Effect of 4-aminopyridine on axonal conduction-block in chronic spinal cord injury", BRAIN RES. BULL., (1989), vol. 22, pages 47 - 52
    - BLIGHT, A.R., GRUNER, J.A., "Augmentation by 4-aminopyridine of vestibulospinal free fall responses in chronic spinal- injured cats", J. NEUROL. SCI., (1987), vol. 82, pages 145 - 159
    - BLIGHT, A.R., "The effects of 4-aminopyridine on neurological deficits in chronic cases of traumatic spinal cord injury in dogs: a phase I clinical trial", J. NEUROTRAUMA, (1991), vol. 8, pages 103 - 119
    - HAYES ET AL., "Effects of intravenous 4-aminopyridine on neurological function in chronic spinal cord injured patients: preliminary observations", PROC. IBRO WORLD CONF. NEUROSCI., (1991), page 345
    - KEITH C. HAYES, PATRICK J. POTTER, ROBERT R. HANSEBOUT, JOANNE M. BUGARESTI, JANE T. C. HSIEH, SERA NICOSIA, MITCHELL A. KATZ, AND, CLINICAL NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 185 - 192
    - T. HIGUCHI, V. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14
    - S.M. BARGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
 US20040560894
 US20040010828
Opposition   - DAVIS et al., "Orally administered 4-aminopyridine improves clinical signs in multiple sclerosis", Ann Neurol., (19900200), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 186 - 192, XP055260954

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ana.410270215