Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2364946

EP2364946 - Elevator apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2011/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Kenichi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / Kigawa, Hiroshi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
03 / Yumura, Takashi
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
04 / Matsuoka, Tatsuo
c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2011/37]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/14]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2011/37]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date11160959.031.05.2004
[2011/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2364946
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2364946
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:B66B1/34, B66B5/04
[2012/07]
Former International [2011/37]B66B3/02, B66B1/34, B66B5/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   NL,   PT [2011/37]
TitleGerman:Aufzugsvorrichtung[2011/37]
English:Elevator apparatus[2011/37]
French:Appareil d'ascenseur[2011/37]
Examination procedure16.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/04]
24.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2013Fee for grant paid
15.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04745620.7  / EP1752407
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.01.2014  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Otis Elevator Company
Ten Farm Spring Road
Farmington CT 06032 / US
Opponent's representative
Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Pelkovenstraße 143
80992 München / DE
 [2019/10]
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  03.01.2014  21.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Otis Elevator Company
Ten Farm Spring Road
Farmington CT 06032 / US
Opponent's representative
Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  03.01.2014   
Otis Elevator Company
Ten Farm Spring Road
Farmington CT 06032 / US
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
17.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.04.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0823/16
01.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL03.04.2013
FR03.06.2013
ES14.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
[2014/24]
Former [2013/48]NL03.04.2013
ES14.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]PT05.08.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US5070967  (KATZY KLAUS [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4387436  (KATAYAMA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 16 * * figures 1,4,6 *;
 [A]US4658935  (HOLLAND GORDON A [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,7-12 *
by applicantJPH06271236
 GB2262166
 JPS5477939