Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2364946

Designated contracting states DE 
 ESLapse: 14.07.2013
 FRLapse: 03.06.2013
 NLLapse: 03.04.2013
 PTLapse: 05.08.2013
Examination procedure15.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted03.04.2013
Opposition procedure02.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
Appeal following opposition05.04.2016APPEAL FILED
01.06.2016APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:14.09.2011 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1752407
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:14.09.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR NL PT
 
Event date:06.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 602004041622 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B66B0003020000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B0001340000
 
Event date:25.01.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20111216
 
Event date:08.02.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B 3/02 20060101AFI20120105BHEP
 
Event date:08.02.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B 1/34 20060101ALI20120105BHEP
 
Event date:08.02.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B 5/04 20060101ALI20120105BHEP
 
Event date:15.02.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B 1/34 20060101AFI20120106BHEP
 
Event date:15.02.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B66B 5/04 20060101ALI20120106BHEP
 
Event date:22.02.2012 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20120124
 
Event date:03.04.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR NL PT
 
Event date:03.04.2013 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:1752407
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:29.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602004041622 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20130529
 
Event date:18.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20130403
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130714
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130403
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20130805
 
Event date:12.02.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
Effective DATE:20140103
 
Event date:07.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20140131
 
Event date:20.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602004041622 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20140103
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130603
 
Event date:26.07.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
Effective DATE:20140103
 
Event date:06.03.2019 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
Effective DATE:20140103
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190521
Year of Fee Payment:16