Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2377979 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2377979



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2080
30.03.2022 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
01.02.2022 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
01.02.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
01.02.2022 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
08.12.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.12.2021 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
17.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
17.11.2021 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 8
05.11.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.11.2021 Drawings Appeal 6
02.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.11.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
02.11.2021 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.10.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.10.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.10.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.10.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.2021 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
13.09.2021 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
20.05.2021 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.05.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.05.2021 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.09.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.09.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.09.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.08.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
31.08.2020 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.08.2020 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.03.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
21.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
21.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Claims Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Claims Appeal 7
21.11.2018 Claims Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Claims Appeal 8
21.11.2018 Claims Appeal 7
21.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.11.2018 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
19.07.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.07.2018 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.07.2018 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
16.05.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
11.05.2018 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
11.05.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
07.05.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.05.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.03.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
23.03.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.03.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.03.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
05.03.2018 Request for correction Opposition 1
02.03.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.02.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
23.02.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
23.02.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 19
23.02.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.02.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.01.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
07.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
07.12.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 45
06.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 8
30.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
30.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 7
30.11.2017 Claims Opposition 8
30.11.2017 Claims Opposition 7
30.11.2017 Claims Opposition 7
30.11.2017 Claims Opposition 7
30.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.11.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
30.11.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
30.11.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.11.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
14.06.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Authorisation Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.06.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
06.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
31.01.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.01.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 58
31.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.05.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.05.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.05.2016 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.05.2016 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 9
13.05.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
21.01.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.01.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 44
16.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
16.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 50
16.12.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
16.12.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.12.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 6
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 32
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 40
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 64
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 20
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 11
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 18
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 12
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 60
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 22
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 18
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 14
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 38
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.12.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 9
10.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
10.12.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
10.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.03.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.02.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
30.01.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
30.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
07.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.11.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
07.11.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 76
29.10.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.10.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 4
30.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
30.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
30.09.2014 Claims Search / examination 9
30.09.2014 Description Search / examination 3
30.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.06.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
26.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 9
26.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.10.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.10.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.04.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
04.05.2012 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
18.04.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
18.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
18.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
18.04.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.04.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
18.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 8
24.10.2011 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.09.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 5
15.09.2011 European search report Search / examination 2
22.06.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 Priority document Search / examination 65
23.05.2011 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
19.04.2011 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.04.2011 Claims Search / examination 8
05.04.2011 Description Search / examination 21
05.04.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 Drawings Search / examination 46
05.04.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
05.04.2011 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1