EP2434420 - Systems and methods for biopolymer engineering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DNA TWOPOINTO INC. 1140 O'Brien Drive, Suite A Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gustafsson, Claes 2823 Alhambra Drive Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
Govindarajan, Sridhar 530 Osprey Drive Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
Minshull, Jeremy Stephen 679 Los Ninos Way Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11161151.3 | 30.07.2004 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | US20030491815P | 01.08.2003 Original published format: US 491815 P | US20040536357P | 14.01.2004 Original published format: US 536357 P | US20040536862P | 15.01.2004 Original published format: US 536862 P | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2434420 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2434420 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/16, G06F19/24, // C07K16/46, C07K16/10 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
G16B20/00 (EP,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,US);
C07K16/1027 (EP,US);
C07K16/461 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US);
G16B15/20 (EP,US);
G16B20/50 (EP,US);
G16B40/30 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
G16B40/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | G06F19/16, // C07K16/46, C07K16/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Biopolymeren | [2012/13] | English: | Systems and methods for biopolymer engineering | [2012/13] | French: | Systèmes et procédés d'ingénierie de biopolymère | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 04.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04779720.4 / EP1660970 | EP08003668.4 / EP1939779 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - NORINDER U ET AL, "A QUANTITATIVE STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP STUDY OF SOME SUBSTANCE P-RELATED PEPTIDES. A MULTIVARIATE APPROACH USING PLS AND VARIABLE SELECTION", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE RESEARCH, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD., OXFORD, GB, (19970201), vol. 49, no. 2, ISSN 1397-002X, pages 155 - 162, XP000679593 [I] 1-21 * page 155, column R - page 156, column r * * page 160, column R, line 24 - line 56 * | [A] - GUSTAFSSON C ET AL, "Putting engineering back into protein engineering: bioinformatic approaches to catalyst design", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20030715), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 366 - 370, XP002411814 [A] 1-21 * page 367, column L, line 1 - page 368, column R, line 41 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(03)00101-0 | [A] - WOLD S ET AL, Partial Least squares projections to latent structure, 3D QSAR IN DRUG DESIGN : THEORY, METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, ESCOM, NL, PAGE(S) 523 - 550, (19930101), ISBN 978-90-72199-14-0, XP009141792 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - T. Hastie, R. Tibshirani, J. Friedman, The Elements of Statistical Learning, pages 217-218, 246, 299-301, Springer-Verlag, (2001), ISBN 0-387-95284-5, XP002677442 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - RICHARD D CRARNER ET AL, "Crossvalidation, Bootstrapping, and Partial Least Squares Compared with Multiple Regression in Conventional QSAR Studies", QUANTITATIVE STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS, VCH PUBLISHERS, DEERFIELD BEACH, FL, US, (19880101), vol. 7, ISSN 0931-8771, pages 18 - 25, XP007915949 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4816567 | GB2276169 | US5681702 | US5780610 | - STEMMER, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 51 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 91 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, pages 100 - 2 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291 | - NESS ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1999), vol. 17, pages 893 - 896 | - VOLKOV ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1999), vol. 27, page E18 | - VOLKOV ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (2000), vol. 328, pages 447 - 56 | - VOLKOV ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL, (2000), vol. 328, pages 456 - 63 | - COCO ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 19, pages 354 - 9 | - GIBBS ET AL., GENE, (2001), vol. 271, pages 13 - 20 | - NINKOVIC ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2001), vol. 30, pages 530 - 4,536 | - COCO ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1246 - 50 | - NESS ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 20, pages 1251 - 5 | - AGUINALDO ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 231, pages 105 - 10 | - COCO, METHODS MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 231, pages 111 - 27 | - SUN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2003), vol. 34, pages 278 - 80,282,284 | - NORINDER ET AL., J PEPT RES, (1997), vol. 49, pages 155 - 62 | - BUCHT ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1999), vol. 1431, pages 471 - 82 | - GUNKEL ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1989), vol. 179, pages 185 - 194 | - DEL SOL MESA ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 326, pages 1289 - 302 | - CASARI ET AL., NAT STRUCT BIOL., (1995), vol. 2, pages 171 - 8 | - GOGOS ET AL., PROTEINS, (2000), vol. 40, pages 98 - 105 | - GRIBSKOV, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 4355 | - "An introduction to Hidden Markov models for biological sequences", KROGH ET AL., Computational Methods in Molecular Biology, ELSEVIER | - OVERINGTON ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (1992), vol. 1, page 216 | - HUBBARD, PROTEIN ENG, (1987), vol. 1, page 159 | - BOWIE, EISENBERG, NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, page 83 | - NOVERE ET AL., BIOPHYS. JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 76, pages 2329 - 2345 | - DUDA ET AL., Pattern Classification, JOHN WILEY & SONS | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 80 | - DOPAZO, COMPUT APPL BIOSCI, (1997), vol. 13, pages 313 - 7 | - ZHANG, J COMPUT BIOL, (2002), vol. 9, pages 487 - 503 | - KOSHI ET AL., PAC SYMP BIOCOMPUT, (2001), pages 191 - 202 | - O. SOYER, M.W. DIMMIC, R.R. NEUBIG, R.A. GOLDSTEIN, PACIFIC SYMPOSIUM ON BIOCOMPUTING, (2002), vol. 7, pages 625 - 636 | - KOSHI, GOLDSTEIN, MOL. EVOL., (1996), vol. 42, pages 313 - 320 | - ZHANG, ROSENBERG, PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, pages 5486 - 5491 | - BENNER ET AL., RES MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 151, pages 97 - 106 | - SUZUKI, GOJOBORI, MOL. BIOL. EVOL., (1999), vol. 16, pages 1315 - 1328 | - ACTA CRYST. D, (2002), vol. 58, no. 6-1, pages 899 - 907 | - P. E. BOURNE, H. WEISSIG, HOBOKEN, NJ, Structural Bioinformatics, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (2003), pages 181 - 198 | - PRIVALOV ET AL., ADV PROTEIN CHEM, (1988), vol. 39, pages 191 - 234 | - LEE, PROTEIN SCI, (1993), vol. 2, pages 733 - 8 | - FREIRE, METHODS MOL BIOL, (2001), vol. 168, pages 37 - 68 | - GUEROIS ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2002), vol. 320, pages 369 - 87 | - MAY, PROTEIN ENG, (1994), vol. 7, pages 475 - 85 | - OCHAGAVIA, BIOINFORMATICS, (2002), vol. 18, pages 637 - 40 | - OVERINGTON, GENET ENG (N Y), (1992), vol. 14, pages 231 - 49 | - OVERINGTON ET AL., PROTEIN SCI, (1992), vol. 1, pages 216 - 26 | - LUTHY ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 83 - 5 | - KOSHI ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1995), vol. 8, pages 641 - 645 | - BENNER ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1994), vol. 7, pages 1323 - 1332 | - TOMII ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (1996), vol. 9, pages 27 - 36 | - CASARI ET AL., NAT STRUCT BIOL, (1995), vol. 2, pages 171 - 178 | - DEL SOL MESA ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 326, pages 1289 - 1302 | - PLACKETT ET AL., BIOMETRIKA, (1946), vol. 33, pages 305 - 325 | - GANDHI ET AL., LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 2076, page 225 | - MOORE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2001), vol. 13, pages 3226 - 3231 | - MOORE, MARANAS, J THEOR BIOL., (2000), vol. 205, pages 483 - 503 | - SANDBERG ET AL., J MED CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 2481 - 91 | - AITA ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2000), vol. 54, pages 64 - 79 | - AITA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (2001), vol. 14, pages 633 - 8 | - CHOULIER ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (2002), vol. 15, pages 373 - 82 | - PRUSIS ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (2002), vol. 15, pages 305 - 11 | - AITA ET AL., BIOPOLYMERS, (2002), vol. 64, pages 95 - 105 | - SWITZER ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 32, pages 10489 - 10496 | - TOR ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1993), vol. 115, pages 4461 - 4467 | - MANTSCH ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 14, pages 5593 - 5601 | - PICCIRILLI ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 343, pages 33 - 37 | - LEACH ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 3675 - 3683 | - WINTER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - INBAR ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1972), vol. 69, pages 2659 - 2662 | - EHRLICH ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 19, pages 4091 - 4096 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - PACK ET AL., BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 31, pages 1579 - 1584 | - CUMBER ET AL., J IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 149B, pages 120 - 126 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - SMITH, WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN, WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC. NAT'1. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - GAP, BESTFIT, FASTA, TFASTA, Wisconsin Genetics Software Package, Genetics Computer Group, MADISON, page 575 | - DECKER ET AL., APPL BIOCHEM BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 105, pages 689 - 703 | - SUHAIL A ISLAM, JINGCHU LUO, MICHAEL J E STEMBERG, "Identification and analysis of domains in proteins", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 8, pages 513 - 525 | - ORENGO ET AL., "CATH- A Hierarchic Classification of Protein Domain Structures", STRUCTURE, (1997), vol. 5, pages 1093 - 1108 | - PEARL ET AL., "Assigning genomic sequences to CATH", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 277 - 282 | - KUNKEL, PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1985), vol. 82, pages 488 - 92 | - LING, ROBINSON, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1997), vol. 254, page 157 | - ZOLLER, CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1992), vol. 3, page 348 | - DENG ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 200, page 81 | - PIERCE, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1994), vol. 16, pages 708 - 15 | - MANDECKI, BOLLING, GENE, (1988), vol. 68, pages 101 - 7 | - EDGE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, pages 756 - 62 | - JAYARAMAN, PUCCINI, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, pages 392 - 8 | - JAYARAMAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1991), vol. 88, pages 4084 - 8 | - YE ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1992), vol. 186, pages 143 - 9 | - HORTON ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 77, pages 61 - 8 | - STEMMER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, pages 49 - 53 | - SANDHU ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 12, pages 14 - 6 | - MAJUMDER, GENE, (1992), vol. 110, pages 89 - 94 | - AU ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1998), vol. 248, pages 200 - 3 | - CHALMERS, CURNOW, BIOTECHNIQUES, (2001), vol. 30, pages 249 - 52 | - CICCARELLI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, pages 1243 - 8 | - KHUDYAKOV ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2747 - 54 | - RAYMOND ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1999), vol. 26, pages 134 - 141 | - HOOVER, LUBKOWSKI, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, page E43 | - GAYTAN ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (1998), vol. 5, page 519 | - LYTTLE ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1995), vol. 19, page 274 | - VIRNEKAS ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, page 5600 | - SONDEK, SHORTLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 3581 | - LAHR ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, page 14860 | - CHATELLIER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 229, page 282 | - HAAPARANTA, HUSE, MOL DIVERS, (1995), vol. 1, page 39 | - HORTON ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 77, page 61 | - SHI ET AL., PCR METHODS APPL., (1993), vol. 3, page 46 | - CAO, TECHNIQUE, (1990), vol. 2, page 109 | - BERGER ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1993), vol. 214, page 571 | - PAL ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR PURIF., (2003), vol. 29, pages 185 - 92 | - HYUN BAE ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (2003), vol. 328, pages 1071 - 81 | - HOHSAKA, SISIDO, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (2002), vol. 6, pages 809 - 15 | - LI, ROBERTS, CHEM. BIOL, (2003), vol. 10, pages 233 - 9 | - LEADLEY, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (1997), vol. 1, pages 162 - 8 | - QUE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1999), vol. 96, pages 11740 - 5 | - TANG, MCDANIEL, CHEM BIOL., (2001), vol. 8, pages 547 - 55 | - OLSEN ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 11, pages 331 - 7 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2001), vol. 6, pages 401 - 11 | - SCHWANEBERG ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2001), vol. 6, pages 111 - 7 | - SCHMIDT ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 69, pages 297 - 303 | - WASLIDGE ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 231, pages 354 - 8 | - KASSACK ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2002), vol. 7, pages 233 - 46 | - DAUGHERTY ET AL., J IMMUNOL METHODS, (2000), vol. 243, pages 211 - 27 | - GEORGIOU, ADV PROTEIN CHEM, (2000), vol. 55, pages 293 - 315 | - JOO ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (1999), vol. 6, pages 699 - 706 | - JOEM ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2001), vol. 6, pages 219 - 23 | - TANGRI ET AL., CURR MED CHEM, (2002), vol. 9, pages 2191 - 9 | - TURCONI ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2001), vol. 6, pages 275 - 90 | - JENH ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1998), vol. 256, pages 47 - 55 | - SKOREY ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 291, pages 269 - 78 | - YEUNG ET AL., BIOTECHNOL PROG, (2002), vol. 18, pages 212 - 20 | - KIM ET AL., APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (2000), vol. 66, pages 788 - 93 | - KACZMARCZYK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2003), vol. 31, page E86 | - PARKER ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2000), vol. 5, pages 77 - 88 | - ALLEN ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2002), vol. 7, pages 35 - 44 | - KRISTJANSDOTTIR ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2003), vol. 316, pages 41 - 9 | - LUTHI ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2003), vol. 1620, pages 167 - 78 | - YOUNG ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1998), vol. 16, pages 946 - 50 | - BAKER ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 16537 - 42 | - GLICK ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2002), vol. 33, pages 1136 - 42,1144 | - JANKOWSKI ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 290, pages 324 - 9 | - RAILLARD ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (2001), vol. 8, pages 891 - 8 | - FAHEY ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 290, pages 272 - 6 | - MALLON ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 294, pages 48 - 54 | - SOTTILE ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 293, pages 124 - 8 | - THOMPSON ET AL., TOXICOL SCI, (2000), vol. 57, pages 43 - 53 | - WARRIOR ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (1999), vol. 4, pages 129 - 135 | - MCMAHON ET AL., J BIOMOL SCREEN, (2000), vol. 5, pages 169 - 76 | - ZHANG ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2000), vol. 281, pages 182 - 6 | - MOORE ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (1996), vol. 14, pages 458 - 67 | - YANG ET AL., PROTEIN ENG, (2002), vol. 15, pages 147 - 52 | - KOGA ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 331, pages 585 - 92 | - LIEBETON ET AL., CHEM BIOL, (2000), vol. 7, pages 709 - 18 | - HENKE ET AL., BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 380, pages 1029 - 33 | - YANO ET AL., J ORG CHEM, (2003), vol. 68, pages 1314 - 8 | - ZANDONELLA ET AL., EUR J BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 231, pages 50 - 5 | - DUQUE ET AL., J LIPID RES, (1996), vol. 37, pages 868 - 76 | - ZANDONELLA ET AL., CHIRALITY, (1996), vol. 8, pages 481 - 89 | - HERMETTER, METHODS MOL BIOL, (1999), vol. 109, pages 19 - 29 | - CHAHINIAN ET AL., LIPIDS, (2002), vol. 37, pages 653 - 62 | - YEO ET AL., J GEN APPL MICROBIOL, (1998), vol. 44, pages 147 - 152 | - TOMIC ET AL., J MOL GRAPH MODEL, (2002), vol. 21, pages 241 - 52 | - GRISWOLD, METHODS MOL BIOL, (2003), vol. 230, pages 203 - 11 | - KUBINYI, 3D QSAR in drug design theory methods and applications, PERGAMON PRESS, (1990), pages 589 - 638 | - BRYAN, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2000), vol. 1543, pages 203 - 222 | - SROGA ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2002), vol. 78, pages 761 - 9 | - GELADI ET AL., ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1986), vol. 186, pages 1 - 17 | - HELLBERG ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1987), vol. 30, pages 1126 - 35 | - ERIKSSON ET AL., ACTA CHEM SCAND, (1990), vol. 44, pages 50 - 55 | - JONSSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 733 - 739 | - LIN ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL, (2002), vol. 41, pages 4402 - 25 | - NESS ET AL., ADV PROTEIN CHEM, (2000), vol. 55, pages 261 - 292 | - O'CONNEL, COMP. PHYS. COMM., (1974), vol. 8, page 49 | - HELLBERG ET AL., INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, (1991), vol. 37, pages 414 - 424 | - FASANO ET AL., ARCH INTERN MED, (2003), vol. 163, pages 286 - 92 | - GREEN ET AL., LANCET, (2003), vol. 362, pages 383 - 91 | - SOLLID, DIGESTIVE DISEASES, (1998), vol. 16, pages 345 - 7 | - MURRAY ET AL., AM J CLIN NUTR, (2004), vol. 79, pages 669 - 73 | - COLLIN ET AL., ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER, (2004), vol. 19, pages 1277 - 83 | - DIEFENTHAL ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 40, pages 90 - 97 | - CHOTHIA, LESK, EMBO JOURNAL, (1986), vol. 5, pages 823 - 826 | US20030491815 | US20040536357 | US20040536862 |