Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2508566

EP2508566 - Silane crosslinkable polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.04.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2012/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Sultan, Bernt-Åke
Söbackevägen 16
SE-444 42, Stenungsund / SE
02 / Dahlen, Kristian
Karins väg 19
44460, Stora Höga / SE
03 / Gkourmpis, Thomas
Kjellbergsgatan 6, 6tr
41132, Göteborg / SE
04 / Anker, Martin
Töltvägen 2
42543, Hisings Kärra / SE
05 / Nylander, Perry
Kopparslagaregatan 42
41261, Göteborg / SE
06 / Fagrell, Ola
Gullkragevägen 5
SE-444 45, Stenungsund / SE
07 / Lindbom, Lena
Tulllare Hög 1281
44290, Kungälv / SE
08 / Verheule, Bart
Fr. Cretenlaan 5
2627, Schelle / BE
 [2012/41]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Campbell, Neil Boyd
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2012/41]Campbell, Neil Boyd
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date11161485.507.04.2011
[2012/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2508566
Date:10.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2508566
Date:28.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08L43/04, H01B3/44, C08L23/08
[2012/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/41]
TitleGerman:Silanvernetzbare Polymerzusammensetzung[2012/41]
English:Silane crosslinkable polymer composition[2012/41]
French:Composition de polymère réticulable au silane[2012/41]
Examination procedure04.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/20]
10.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2014Fee for grant paid
14.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2015  06.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2015/17]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2015  06.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2015   
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
de Jong, Nicolaas Henricus Maria
Dow Benelux B.V. Patent Department Herbert H. Dowweg 5
4542 NM Hoek / NL
09.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0459/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
10.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.04.2011
AL28.05.2014
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
IE07.04.2015
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU07.04.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MK28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
IE07.04.2015
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2017/38]HU07.04.2011
AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
BG28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
IS28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
SM28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
IE07.04.2015
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2017/03]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
MT28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
IE07.04.2015
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/20]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
IE07.04.2015
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/06]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
LU07.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
Former [2016/01]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
MC28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
LU07.04.2015
Former [2015/52]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
LU07.04.2015
Former [2015/36]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SI28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2015/12]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NL28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RO28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
CZ28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
EE28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
SK28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT28.05.2014
BE28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
DK28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/52]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
RS28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT28.05.2014
CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
HR28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
LV28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
GR29.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY28.05.2014
FI28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
NO28.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY28.05.2014
LT28.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY28.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0193317  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-18 * page 7, line 5 - line 21 * * examples 11-14 *;
 [A]EP1923404  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0041] *