Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2338551

EP2338551 - A device and a system for delivery of biological material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wockhardt Limited
D-4, MIDC Industrial Area Chikalthana
Aurangabad 431210 / IN
[2011/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Kodgule, Mandar
Global IP Wockhardt Research Centre B/8/15, Doodshagar CHS, Ciba Road, Goregaon (East)
400065, Mumbai / IN
02 / Yallambalsi, Sachindananda
Wockhardt Research Centre Flat no. 9, Plot No. 133/134, Akshay Park Apartments, "A" sector, N-1, Near St. Xavier School
431003, Aurangabad / IN
 [2011/26]
Representative(s)May, Mark Andrew
MayReiprich
Am Wald 3
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/26]May, Mark Andrew
MayReiprich P.O. Box 12 55
85312 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date11161766.805.06.2009
[2011/26]
Priority number, dateIN2008MUM121206.06.2008         Original published format: IN MU12122008
IN2008MUM121306.06.2008         Original published format: IN MU12132008
IN2008MUM121406.06.2008         Original published format: IN MU12142008
[2011/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2338551
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2338551
Date:16.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/168, A61M37/00
[2011/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und System zur Freisetzung von biologischem Material[2011/26]
English:A device and a system for delivery of biological material[2011/26]
French:Dispositif et système pour l'administration d'un matériel biologique[2011/26]
Examination procedure29.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/19]
16.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/22]
27.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/22]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09757988.2  / EP2296731
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090757988) is  13.10.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008027011  (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 9 * * page 17, line 5 - page 19, line 24; figures 16a-17 *;
 [X]WO03022330  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * sentences 1a-b, paragraphs 31-38 *;
 [X]WO2008007370  (NANOPASS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 8, lines 13-18 * * page 14, lines 4-14; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]WO02100459  (ENDOBIONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-1a * * paragraph [0044]; figures 12-13 * * paragraph [0012] *;
 [X]WO0245771  (BIOVALVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9320784  (OREGON STATE [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, lines 1-19; figures 1-4 *;
 [XP]WO2008147117  (MCURE CO LTD [KR], et al) [XP] 1,4 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantUS6702779
 US6939324
 US2005119618
 WO2007115039
 US7056495
 US6586006
 US6565871
 US6331310
 US6290991
 US6811792
 US6893657
 US7141034
 US7083592
 US2005008683
 US2005010193
 EP1880741