Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2378785

EP2378785 - Display apparatus, 3D glasses, and display system including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2011/42]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yoon, Hyun-jin
91-121, Sadang-dong,
Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Hwang, Tae-don
104-1801, Jugong Greenvill Apt.,
Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/42]Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date11161905.211.04.2011
[2011/42]
Priority number, dateKR2010003534216.04.2010         Original published format: KR 20100035342
[2011/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2378785
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2378785
Date:30.11.2011
[2011/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, H04N13/04
[2011/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung, 3D-Brille und Anzeigesystem damit[2011/42]
English:Display apparatus, 3D glasses, and display system including the same[2011/42]
French:Appareil d'affichage, lunettes 3D et système d'affichage les comportant[2011/42]
Examination procedure26.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/18]
30.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2016
30.11.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/16]
11.12.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
18.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6188442  (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,7,12,14;
 [XI]US2004056948  (GIBSON ROBERT JOHN [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,12,14;
 [XI]US2007263003  (KO HEINRICH S [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0010] - [0031] - [0037] - [0040] - [0042] - [0045] - [0046] * [I] 1-3,5-7,12-15;
 [A]EP2169967  (DISNEY ENTPR INC [US]) [A] 1,4,8,15 * abstract *