EP2511584 - Compressed air coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEJN AB Box 245 541 25 Skövde / SE | [2014/02] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Cejn AB Box 245 541 25 Skövde / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engdahl, Björn Linnégatan 78 115 23, Stockholm / SE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Ljungberg, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/20] | Ljungberg, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Mannerheimintie 12B 5th Floor FI-00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/42] | Johansson Webjörn, Ingmari, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11162404.5 | 14.04.2011 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2511584 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2511584 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12, F16L37/42, F16L37/084 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
F16L37/0848 (EP,US);
F16L37/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16L33/035 (CN);
F16L37/138 (US);
F16L37/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | F16L37/12, F16L37/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | Druckluftkupplung | [2012/42] | English: | Compressed air coupling | [2012/42] | French: | Couplage d'air comprimé | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2011 | AL | 08.01.2014 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | RS | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IE | 14.04.2014 | LU | 14.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MK | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IE | 14.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 14.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0664866 (ENGDAHL BJOERN [SE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0839298 (ENGDAHL BJOERN [SE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9747911 (ENGDAHL BJOERN [SE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0839298 | EP0664866 |