Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2392592

EP2392592 - Hypoallergenic chimeric proteins belonging to the lipid transfer family of parietaria judaica for use in the treatment of allergies. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bial Industrial Farmaceutica, S.A.
Alameda de Urquijo 27
48008 Bilbao / ES
[2016/50]
Former [2011/49]For all designated states
Bial Industrial Farmaceutica, S.A.
Alameda de Urquijo 27
48008 Bilbao / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Asturias Ortega, Juan Andrés
c/ Errekagane 16, 2ºA
48930 Getxo / ES
02 / Martinez Garate, Alberto
Av. Cristóbal Murrieta 15B, 1ºF
48980 Santurce / ES
03 / Gonzalez Rioja, Roberto
c/ Economia 42, 8º B
48902 Barakaldo / ES
 [2011/49]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/50]Armstrong, Iain Cheshire , et al
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Former [2014/07]Armstrong, Iain Cheshire , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Former [2012/09]Harrison Goddard Foote
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester
M1 5WG / GB
Former [2011/49]Durán Olivella, Alfonso
DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date11162543.011.04.2007
[2011/49]
Priority number, dateES2006000095512.04.2006         Original published format: ES 200600955
[2011/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2392592
Date:07.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2392592
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/415, C12N15/29, A61K39/36
[2011/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2011/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hypoallergene chimäre Proteine, die zu der Lipidtransferfamilie von Parietaria judaica gehören, zur Verwendung bei der Behandlung von Allergien[2011/49]
English:Hypoallergenic chimeric proteins belonging to the lipid transfer family of parietaria judaica for use in the treatment of allergies.[2011/49]
French:Protéines chimères hypoallergéniques appartenant à la famille de transfert des lipides de Parietaria judaica pour une utilisation dans le traitement d'allergies[2011/49]
Examination procedure31.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
25.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2016Fee for grant paid
03.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07734344.0  / EP2007798
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070734344) is  16.04.2009
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.03.2015Request for further processing filed
27.03.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.04.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.05.2014Request for further processing filed
15.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.05.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
25.09.2012Request for further processing filed
25.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.04.2007
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
GB11.04.2017
IE11.04.2017
LU11.04.2017
MT11.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
GB11.04.2017
IE11.04.2017
LU11.04.2017
MT11.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
GB11.04.2017
IE11.04.2017
LU11.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
GB11.04.2017
LU11.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/07]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/35]CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO2005085278  (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT], et al) [DX] 1-3,7-9,12-20 * claims 1-23 * [Y] 4-6,10-11;
 [Y]EP1219301  (SHAN BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSCHAFT [AT]) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [PXY]WO2006058359  (BIOMAY PROD & HANDEL [AT], et al) [PX] 1 * pages 6,29; claim 14 * [Y] 2-20
 [Y]  - COLOMBO P ET AL, "Identification of an immunodominant IgE epitope of the Parietaria judaica major allergen", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19980315), vol. 160, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2780 - 2785, XP002186915 [Y] 4-6,10-11 * abstract *
 [Y]  - ASTURIAS J A ET AL, "Par j 1 and Par j 2, the major allergens from Parietaria judaica pollen, have similar immunoglobulin E epitopes.", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (200304), vol. 33, no. 4, ISSN 0954-7894, pages 518 - 524, XP002448730 [Y] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x
 [Y]  - LINHART ET AL, "Molecular design of allergy vaccines", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (200512), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0952-7915, pages 646 - 655, XP005130321 [Y] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2005.09.010
 [Y]  - FERREIRA F ET AL, "GENETIC ENGINEERING OF ALLERGENS: FUTURE THERAPEUTIC PRODUCTS", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, (200207), vol. 128, no. 3, ISSN 1018-2438, pages 171 - 178, XP009011303 [Y] 1-20 * pages 174-176 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000064249
 [Y]  - FERREIRA FÁTIMA ET AL, "Modified recombinant allergens for safer erapy.immunothERAPY", INFLAMMATION & ALLERGY DRUG TARGETS, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (20060101), vol. 5, no. 1, ISSN 1871-5281, pages 5 - 14, XP008141170 [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [02.3]; figure 1 *
 [PY]  - BANNON GARY A ET AL, "Evaluation of available IgE-binding epitope data and its utility in bioinformatics", MOLECULAR NUTRITION & FOOD RESEARCH, (200607), vol. 50, no. 7, ISSN 1613-4125, pages 638 - 644, XP002448731 [PY] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.200500276
Examination   - BONURA A ET AL, "A hybrid expressing genetically engineered major allergens of the Parietaria pollen as a tool for specific allergy vaccination", INTERNATIONAL ARCHIVES OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, KARGER AG, CH, vol. 142, no. 4, doi:10.1159/000097358, ISSN 1018-2438, (20070301), pages 274 - 284, (20061122), XP008163684

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000097358
by applicantWO2005085278
    - "Increased prevalence of pollen allergy in Japan", MIYAMOTO, T., Advances in Allergology and Clinical Immunology, THE PARTHENON PUBLISHING GROUP, pages 343 - 347,
    - AKDIS, C.A., BLASER, K., "Mechanisms of allergen-specific immunotherapy", ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 55, pages 522 - 530,
    - AKDIS, C.A., JOSS, A., AKDIS, M., BLASER, K., "Mechanism of IL-10 induced cell inactivation in allergic inflammation and normal response to allergens", INT. ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 124, pages 180 - 182,
    - MOVERATE, R., "Immunological mechanisms of specific immunotherapy with pollen vaccines: implications for diagnostics and the development of improved vaccination strategies", EXPERT REV. VACC., (2003), vol. 2, pages 85 - 97, XP009123650
    - WACHHOLZ, P.A., SONI, N.K., TILL, S., DURHAM, S.R., "Inhibition of allergen-IgE binding to B cells by IgG antibodies after grass pollen immunotherapy", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 112, doi:doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(03)02022-0, pages 915 - 922, XP009030552

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(03)02022-0
    - VALENTA, R., LINHART, B., "Molecular design of allergy vaccines", CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 17, pages 1 - 10,
    - NIEDERBERGER, V., HORAK, F., VRTALA, S., SPITZAUER, S, KRAUTH, M.T., VALENT, P., REISINGER, J., PELZMANN, M., HAYEK, B., KRONQVIST, "Vaccination with genetically engineered allergens prevents progression of allergic disease", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 14677 - 14682,
    - SCHMID-GRENDELMEIER, P., KARAMLOO, F., MULLER, U., HOUSLEY-MARCOVIC, Z., SOLDATOVA, L., ZUMKEHR, J., KEMENY, D.M., KUNDIG, T., REI, "Prevention of allergy by a recombinant multi-allergen vaccine with reduced IgE binding and preserved T cell epitopes", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1002/eji.200425522, pages 3268 - 3276, XP002464627

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200425522
    - ALLAM, J.P., NOVAK, N., FUCHS, C., ASEN, S., BERGE, S., APPEL, T. ET AL., "Characterization of dendritic cells from human oral mucosa: a new Langerhans' cell type with high constitutive FccPI expression", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 112, doi:doi:10.1067/mai.2003.1607, pages 141 - 8, XP005687262

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mai.2003.1607
    - VON BUBNOFF, D., MATZ, H., FRAHNERT, C., RAO, M.L., HANAU, D., DE LA SALLE, H., BIEBER, T., "FccPI induces the triptophan degradation pathway involved in regulating T cell responses", J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 169, pages 1810 - 1816,
    - BATARD, T., DIDIERLAURENT, A., CHABRE, H., MOTHES, N., BUSSIERES, L., BOHLE, B. ET AL., "Characterization of wild-type recombinant Bet v la as a candidate vaccine against birch pollen allergy", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 136, pages 239 - 249,
    - JUTEL, M., JAEGER, L., SUCK, R., MEYER, H., FIEBIG, H., CROMWELL, 0., "Allergen-specific immunotherapy with recombinant grass pollen allergens", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 116, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jaci.2005.06.004, pages 608 - 13, XP005068191

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2005.06.004
    - NIEDERBERGER, V., HORAK, F., VRTALA, S., SPITZAUER, S., KRAUTH, M.T., VALENT, P. ET AL., "Vaccination with genetically engineered allergens prevents progression of allergic disease", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 14677 - 82,
    - CROMWELL, 0., FIEBIG, H., SUCK, R., KAHLERT, H., NANDY, A., KETTNER, J. ET AL., "Strategies for recombinant allergen vaccines and fruitful results from first clinical studies", IMMUNOL. ALLERGY CLIN. N. AM., (2006), vol. 26, pages 261 - 81,
    - COLOMBO, P., DURO, G., COSTA, M.A., IZZO, V., MIRISOLA, M., LOCOROTONDO, G., COCCHIARA, R., GERACI, D., "An update on allergens. Parietaria pollen allergens", ALLERGY, (1998), vol. 53, pages 917 - 921, XP009036866
    - "The allergens of Parietaria", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., vol. 130, pages 173 - 179,
    - CARREIRA, J., POLO, F., "The allergens of Olea europaea and Parietaria spp. and their relevance in the Mediterranean Area", ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL. NEWS, (1995), vol. 7, pages 79 - 84,
    - COLOMBO, P., BONURA, A., COSTA, M., IZZO, V., PASSANTINO, R., LICOROTONDO, G., AMOROSO, S., GERASI, D., "The allergens of Parietaria", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 130, pages 173 - 179,
    - AYUSO, R., CARREIRA, J., LOMBARDERO, M., DUFFORT, 0., PERIS, A., BASOMBA, A., POLO, F., "Isolation by mAb based affinity chromatography of two Par j isoallergens. Comparison of their physicochemical, immunochemical and allergenic properties", MOL. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1016/0161-5890(93)90095-S, pages 1347 - 1354, XP023682323

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(93)90095-S
    - POLO, F., AYUSO, R., CARREIRA, J., "HPLC purification of the main allergen of Parietaria judaica pollen", MOL. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/0161-5890(90)90110-L, pages 151 - 157, XP023795465

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(90)90110-L
    - POLO, F., AYUSO, R., CARREIRA, J., "Studies on the relationship between structure and IgE-binding ability of Parietaria judaica allergen", I. MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/0161-5890(91)90101-O, pages 169 - 175, XP023795338

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(91)90101-O
    - DURO, G., COLOMBO, P., COSTA, M.A., IZZO, V., PORCASI, R., DIFIORE, R., LOCOROTONDO, G., MIRISOLA, M.G., COCCHIARA, R., GERACI, D., "cDNA cloning, sequence analysis and allergological characterization of Par j 2.0101, a new major allergen of the Parietaria judaica pollen", FEBS LETT., (1996), vol. 399, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(96)01328-2, pages 295 - 298, XP002909979

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(96)01328-2
    - COSTA, M.A., COLOMBO, P., IZZO, V., KENNEDY, H., VENTURELLA, S., COCCHIARA, R., MISTRELLO, G., FALAGIANI, P., GERACI, D., "cDNA cloning expression and primary structure of Par j I, a major allergen of Parietaria judaica pollen", FEBS LETT., (1994), vol. 341, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(94)80453-2, pages 182 - 186, XP025653857

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(94)80453-2
    - AMORESANO, A., PUCCI, P., DURO, G., COLOMBO, P., COSTA, M.A., IZZO, V., LAMBDA, D., GERACI, D., "Assignment of disulphide bridges in Par j 2.0101, a major allergen of Parietaria judaica pollen", BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 384, pages 1165 - 1172,
    - ASTURIAS, J.A., G6MEZ-BAY6N, N., ESEVERRI, J.L., MARTINEZ, A., "Par j 1 and Par j 2, the major allergens from Parietaria judaica pollen, have similar immunoglobulin E epitopes", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x, pages 518 - 524, XP002448730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x
    - REE, R., "Clinical importance of non-specific lipid transfer proteins as food allergens", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS, (2002), vol. 30, pages 910 - 913,
    - BEEZHOLD, D.H., HICKEY, V.L., KOSTYAL, D.A. ET AL., "Lipid transfer protein from Hevea brasiliensis (Hev b 12), a cross-reactive latex protein", ANN ALLERGY ASTHMA IMMUNOL, (2003), pages 439 - 445, XP026958772
    - DIAZ-PERALES, A., LOMBARDERO, M., SANCHEZ-MONGE, R. ET AL., "Lipid-transfer proteins as potential plant panallergens: cross-reactivity among proteins of Artemisia pollen, Castanea nut and Rosaceae fruits, with different IgE-binding capacities", CLIN EXP ALLERGY, (2000), pages 1403 - 1410,
    - TEJERA, M.L., VILLALBA, M., BATANERO, E., RODRIGUEZ, R., "Identification, isolation, and characterization of Ole e 7, a new allergen of olive tree pollen", J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1999), doi:doi:10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70290-3, pages 797 - 802, XP027420901

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-6749(99)70290-3
    - RODRIGUEZ, R., VILLALBA, M., BATANERO, E. ET AL., "Allergenic diversity of the olive pollen", ALLERGY, (2002), pages 6 - 16,
    - "Expression and purification of the recombinant allergens Par j 1 and Par j 2", GONZALEZ-RIOJA ET AL., XXIII Congreso EAACI, Abstracts Book, pages 181 - 182,
    - HANAHAN, D., "Studies on transformation of Escherichia coli with plasmids", J. MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 166, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(83)80284-8, pages 557 - 580, XP026026690

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(83)80284-8
    - ASTURIAS, J.A, GOMEZ-BAYON, N., ESEVERRI, J.L., MARTINEZ, A., "Par j 1 and Par j 2, the major allergens from Parietaria judaica pollen, have similar immunoglobulin E epitopes", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x, pages 518 - 524, XP002448730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x
    - LAEMMLI, U.K, "Cleavage of structural proteins during the assembly of the head of bacteriophage T4", NATURE, (1970), vol. 277, doi:doi:10.1038/227680a0, pages 680 - 685, XP055108426

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/227680a0
    - TOWBIN, H., STAEHELIN, I., GORDON, J., "Electrophoretic transfer of proteins from polyacrylamide gels to nitrocellulose sheets: Procedure and some applications", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1979), vol. 76, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.76.9.4350, pages 4350 - 4354, XP000884060

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.76.9.4350
    - CESKA, M., LUNDKVIST, U., "A new and simple radioimmunoassay method for the determination of IgE", IMMUNOCHEMISTRY, (1972), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/0019-2791(72)90112-7, pages 1021 - 1030, XP023936860

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0019-2791(72)90112-7
    - AKDIS, C.A., BLASER, K., "Mechanisms of allergen-specific immunotherapy", ALLERGY, (2000), vol. 55, pages 518 - 524,
    - NIEDERBERGER, V., HORAK, F., VRTALA, S., SPITZAUER, S., KRAUTH, M.T., VALENT, P., REISINGER, J., PELZMANN, M., HAYEK, B., KRONQVIS, "Vaccination with genetically engineered allergens prevents progression of allergic disease", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2004), vol. 101, pages 14677 - 14682,
    - BATARD, T., DIDIERLAURENT, A., CHABRE, H., MOTHES, N., BUSSIERES, L., BOHLE, B. ET AL., "Characterization of wild-type recombinant Bet v 1a as a candidate vaccine against birch pollen allergy", INT. ARCH. ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 136, pages 239 - 249,
    - POLO, F., AYUSO, R., CARREIRA, J., "HPLC purification of the main allergen of Parieteria judaica pollen", MOL. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 27, pages 151 - 157,
    - POLO, F., AYUSO, R., CARREIRA, J., "Studies on the relationship between structure and IgE-binding ability of Parieteria judaica allergen I.", MOL. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 28, pages 169 - 175,
    - AMORESANO, A., PUCCI, P., DURO, G., COLOMBO, P., COSTA, M.A., IZZO, V., LAMBDA, D., GERACI, D., "Assigment of disulphide bridges in Par j 2.0101, a major allergen of Parietaria judaica pollen", BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 384, pages 1165 - 1172,
    - ASTURIAS, J.A., GOMEZ-BAYON, N., ESEVERRI, J.L., MARTINEZ, A., "Par j 1 and Par j 2, the major allergens from Parietaria judaica pollen, have similar immunoglobulin E epitopes", CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL ALLERGY, (2003), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x, pages 518 - 524, XP002448730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2222.2003.01631.x
    - VAN REE, R., "Clinical importance of non-specific lipid transfer proteins as food allergens", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS, (2002), vol. 30, pages 910 - 913,
    - LAEMMLI, U.K., "Cleavage of structural proteins during the assambly of the head of bacteriophage T4", NATURE, (1970), vol. 277, pages 680 - 685,